DOMINO FOODS, INC. v. CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DOMINO FOODS, INC.
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY CO., UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY, BNSF RAILWAY CO. and CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00776
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Campbell on behalf of UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Campbell, Christopher)
June 12, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy L. O'Mara on behalf of UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (O'Mara, Timothy)
June 12, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M Wall on behalf of UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Wall, Daniel)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING #35 Motion for Admission of Carlos M. Sires, Pro Hac Vice, #36 Motion for Admission of James Grippando, Pro Hac Vice, and #37 Motion for Admission of Stuart H. Singer, Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Carlos M. Sires, James Grippando, and Stuart H. Singer may enter appearances for the purpose of representing plaintiff Domino Foods, Inc. in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 12, 2020. (lcbah3)
June 10, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- STUART H. SINGER, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7216279. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMINO FOODS, INC. (Riley, Joshua)
June 10, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- JAMES GRIPPANDO, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7216263. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMINO FOODS, INC. (Riley, Joshua)
June 10, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- CARLOS M. SIRES, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7216131. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMINO FOODS, INC. (Riley, Joshua)
June 8, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Fanchiang on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Fanchiang, Eric)
June 8, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Mara Lieber on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Lieber, Mara)
June 8, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Luke P. van Houwelingen on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (van Houwelingen, Luke)
June 8, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Alan Gardiner on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Gardiner, Kent)
June 5, 2020 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY CO..(Reinhart, Tara)
June 5, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand (Domino Foods, Inc.) by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC..(Arteaga, Juan)
June 5, 2020 Filing 28 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (Domino Foods, Inc.) by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Arteaga, Juan)
June 5, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by BNSF RAILWAY CO..(Stein, Linda)
June 4, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY.(Maltas, Allyson)
June 3, 2020 Filing 25 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BNSF RAILWAY CO. (Stein, Linda)
April 22, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Esteban Martin Estrada on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Estrada, Esteban)
April 22, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Conley on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Conley, Anne)
April 21, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacobus P. van der Ven on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (van der Ven, Jacobus)
April 21, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Joseph Horwich on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Horwich, Benjamin)
April 21, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn D. Pomerantz on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Pomerantz, Glenn)
April 15, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Bruder Fox on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY CO. (Fox, Molly)
April 15, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Sue Stein on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY CO. (Stein, Linda)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 27, 2020. (lcbah3)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING #16 Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 27, 2020. (lcbah3)
March 27, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Protective Order by DOMINO FOODS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Singer, Stuart)
March 19, 2020 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 9:20-cv-80285. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 19, 2020 Civil Case Terminated per DE #14 Conditional Transfer Order. Closing Case. (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 3/19/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Filing 14 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-6) transferring case to the District of Columbia re: MDL 2925 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Beryl A. Howell. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 3/19/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay. This case and the obligations imposed by the Court's Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) and (f) shall be stayed for thirty days. On or before April 17, 2020, Plaintiff shall inform the Court of the status of the transfer of this action to Multidistrict Litigation No. 2925 as ordered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: Rail Freight Fuel Surcharge Antitrust Litigation (No. II), Misc. No. 20-00008 (BAH), Dkt. No. 149. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/18/2020. (AHS) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 3/19/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Regarding Defendants' Obligation to File an Answer or Other Response, Order Requiring Scheduling Report, and Deadlines Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) and (f) by Domino Foods, Inc.. Responses due by 4/1/2020 (Singer, Stuart) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 3/19/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 11 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Summons Returned Executed. Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see DE#10. It is not necessary to refile this document. (scn) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 3/19/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Domino Foods, Inc. CSX Transportation, Inc. served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. See DE#6 for image. (scn) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 3/19/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Domino Foods, Inc.. Norfolk Southern Railway Co. served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (Singer, Stuart) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 3/19/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Domino Foods, Inc.. Union Pacific Railroad Company served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (Singer, Stuart) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 3/19/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Domino Foods, Inc.. BNSF Railway Co. served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (Singer, Stuart) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 3/19/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Domino Foods, Inc.. CSX Transportation, Inc. served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (Singer, Stuart)[Transferred from Florida Southern on 3/19/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES, Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 3/19/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE.Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/2/2020. (eca) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 3/19/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BNSF Railway Co., CSX Transportation, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Co., Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(jbs) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 3/19/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 3/19/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12509308, filed by Domino Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) (CSX Transportation, Inc.), #3 Summon(s) (Norfolk Southern Railway Company), #4 Summon(s) (BNSF Railway Company), #5 Summon(s) (Union Pacific Railroad Company))(Singer, Stuart) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 3/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOMINO FOODS, INC. v. CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINO FOODS, INC.
Represented By: James Michael Grippando
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Joshua P. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY CO.
Represented By: Tara L. Reinhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY
Represented By: Allyson M. Maltas
Represented By: Timothy L. O'Mara
Represented By: Christopher Campbell
Represented By: Daniel M Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF RAILWAY CO.
Represented By: Linda Sue Stein
Represented By: Molly Bruder Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: Juan Arteaga
Represented By: Mara Lieber
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Represented By: Luke P. van Houwelingen
Represented By: Eric Fanchiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?