PATTERSON v. LYON et al
Plaintiff: DIMITRI PATTERSON
Defendant: DAILY CALLER, INC., NEW MEDIA INVESTMENT GROUP, INC., FOX CORPORATION, SUNBEAM TELEVISION CORPORATION, JASMINE BRAND, DISNEY INTERACTIVE STUDIOS, INC., CBS BROADCASTING, INC.,, WARNER MEDIA LLC, GATEHOUSE MEDIA FLORIDA HOLDINGS, INC., MIAMI HERALD MEDIA COMPANY, TWENTY-FIRST CENTURY FOX, INC., CBS TELEVISION, INC., GOOGLE, INC., COMCAST CORP., TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY, GANNETT COMPANY, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., NBC UNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC, MEREDITH CORPORATION, FOOTBALL TALK LLC, GATEHOUSE MEDIA MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., BALLER ALERT LLC, COX MEDIA GROUP, AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., VOX MEDIA, INC., ROBERT LITTAL, BH MEDIA GROUP, INC., RICH CIMINI, VERIZON MEDIA LLC, MICROSOFT CORPORATION, NEWS CORPORATION, ROBIN LYON, MAHIR FADLE, NEWSWEEK MEDIA GROUP, INC., IBT MEDIA, INC., CBS CORPORATION, ESPN, INC. and COMCAST CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv00802
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Referring Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 13 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MEREDITH CORPORATION (Mills, David)
May 20, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Hearing (Status Conference) by MEREDITH CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Mills, David)
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David Edward Mills on behalf of MEREDITH CORPORATION (Mills, David)
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 Case directly reassigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton as there is an earlier related case. Judge Emmet G. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DIMITRI PATTERSON (zjf)
May 7, 2020 Filing 8 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GOOGLE, INC. (Hughes, Brendan)
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Whitty Somvichian, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7103466. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GOOGLE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Whitty Somvichian, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hughes, Brendan)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by GOOGLE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hughes, Brendan)
May 6, 2020 Summons (5) Issued as to BALLER ALERT LLC, FOOTBALL TALK LLC, GATEHOUSE MEDIA FLORIDA HOLDINGS, INC., ROBIN LYON, NEWSWEEK MEDIA GROUP, INC.. (zmc)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CBS BROADCASTING, INC.,, CBS CORPORATION, CBS TELEVISION, INC.. Case related to Case No. 20-cv-686-BAH (D.D.C.), 20-cv-688-RBW (D.D.C.), 20-cv-803-RBW (D.D.C.) plus nine cases in Florida federal district courts. (Brown, Jay)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by CBS BROADCASTING, INC.,, CBS CORPORATION, CBS TELEVISION, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Jay)
April 23, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Google, LLC Answer Or Otherwise Response To The Complaint due by 5/7/2020. (mac)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Defendant Google, LLC's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Google, LLC shall file the Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by no later than May 7, 2020. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this Minute Order to Mr. Patterson's address of record by first-class mail, certified receipt. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/22/2020. (lcegs3)
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by GOOGLE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hughes, Brendan)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order.Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/01/20. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac)
March 24, 2020 SUMMONS Not Issued as to BALLER ALERT LLC, FOOTBALL TALK LLC, GATEHOUSE MEDIA FLORIDA HOLDINGS, INC., ROBERT LITTAL, ROBIN LYON, NEWSWEEK MEDIA GROUP, INC. (zjf)
March 24, 2020 Summons (32) Issued as to AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., BH MEDIA GROUP, INC., JASMINE BRAND, CBS BROADCASTING, INC.,, CBS CORPORATION, CBS TELEVISION, INC., RICH CIMINI, COMCAST CORP., COX MEDIA GROUP, DAILY CALLER, INC., DISNEY INTERACTIVE STUDIOS, INC., ESPN, INC., MAHIR FADLE, FOX CORPORATION, GANNETT COMPANY, GATEHOUSE MEDIA MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., GOOGLE, INC., IBT MEDIA, INC., ROBERT LITTAL, MEREDITH CORPORATION, MIAMI HERALD MEDIA COMPANY, MICROSOFT CORPORATION, NBC UNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC, NEW MEDIA INVESTMENT GROUP, INC., NEWS CORPORATION, NEWSWEEK MEDIA GROUP, INC., SUNBEAM TELEVISION CORPORATION, TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY, TWENTY-FIRST CENTURY FOX, INC., VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., VERIZON MEDIA LLC, VOX MEDIA, INC., WARNER MEDIA LLC. (zjf)
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., BALLER ALERT LLC, BH MEDIA GROUP, INC., JASMINE BRAND, CBS BROADCASTING, INC.,, CBS CORPORATION, CBS TELEVISION, INC., RICH CIMINI, COMCAST CORP., COX MEDIA GROUP, DAILY CALLER, INC., DISNEY INTERACTIVE STUDIOS, INC., ESPN, INC., MAHIR FADLE, FOOTBALL TALK LLC, FOX CORPORATION, GANNETT COMPANY, GATEHOUSE MEDIA FLORIDA HOLDINGS, INC., GATEHOUSE MEDIA MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., GOOGLE, INC., IBT MEDIA, INC., ROBERT LITTAL, ROBIN LYON, MEREDITH CORPORATION, MIAMI HERALD MEDIA COMPANY, MICROSOFT CORPORATION, NBC UNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC, NEW MEDIA INVESTMENT GROUP, INC., NEWS CORPORATION, NEWSWEEK MEDIA GROUP, INC., SUNBEAM TELEVISION CORPORATION, TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY, TWENTY-FIRST CENTURY FOX, INC., VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., VERIZON MEDIA LLC, VOX MEDIA, INC., WARNER MEDIA LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616102770) with Jury Demand filed by DIMITRI PATTERSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover ,#3 Exhibit (Minute Order) (zjf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PATTERSON v. LYON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAILY CALLER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW MEDIA INVESTMENT GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOX CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNBEAM TELEVISION CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASMINE BRAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISNEY INTERACTIVE STUDIOS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS BROADCASTING, INC.,
Represented By: Jay Ward Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER MEDIA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GATEHOUSE MEDIA FLORIDA HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIAMI HERALD MEDIA COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWENTY-FIRST CENTURY FOX, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS TELEVISION, INC.
Represented By: Jay Ward Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE, INC.
Represented By: Brendan Joseph Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMCAST CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GANNETT COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBC UNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEREDITH CORPORATION
Represented By: David Edward Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOOTBALL TALK LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GATEHOUSE MEDIA MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BALLER ALERT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COX MEDIA GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VOX MEDIA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT LITTAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BH MEDIA GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICH CIMINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERIZON MEDIA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICROSOFT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEWS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBIN LYON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAHIR FADLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEWSWEEK MEDIA GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IBT MEDIA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: Jay Ward Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESPN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMCAST CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIMITRI PATTERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?