TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al v. UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION et al
Plaintiff: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. and TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Defendant: UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, ALEX M. AZAR, II, STEPHEN M. HAHN and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Intervenor Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. and SANDOZ INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00808
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T Burgess on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (Burgess, Brian)
April 30, 2020 Filing 29 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD - Certified Index by ALEX M. AZAR, II, STEPHEN M. HAHN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Schmidt, Kathryn)
April 29, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Marth on behalf of MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Marth, Christopher)
April 28, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY to opposition re #19 MOTION to Intervene filed by MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Bloodworth, Shannon) Modified to edit text and linkage on 4/29/2020 (zrdj).
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING #23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher J. Marth as Counsel for Proposed-Intervenor Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Accordingly, Christopher J. Marth may enter an appearance of the purpose of representing defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instruct ions Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 28, 2020. (lcbah3)
April 28, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE re #25 Memorandum in Opposition filed by SANDOZ INC.. (Rakoczy, William)
April 27, 2020 Filing 25 Memorandum in opposition to re #19 MOTION to Intervene filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (Jay, William)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING #19 Unopposed Motion to Intervene as Defendant. Accordingly, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. may intervene as a defendant in this action, and shall abide by the April 9, 2020 Scheduling Order already in place. See Min. Order (Apr. 9, 2020). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 27, 2020. (lcbah3)
April 24, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Anstaett on behalf of MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Anstaett, David)
April 24, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher J. Marth, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7058531. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bloodworth, Shannon)
April 24, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Michael White on behalf of MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (White, Brandon)
April 24, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon M. Bloodworth on behalf of MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Bloodworth, Shannon)
April 24, 2020 Filing 20 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Bloodworth, Shannon)
April 24, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Intervene by MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bloodworth, Shannon)
April 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Trang Lin on behalf of SANDOZ INC. (Lin, Trang)
April 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Galligan on behalf of SANDOZ INC. (Galligan, Christopher)
April 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Lara E. FitzSimmons on behalf of SANDOZ INC. (FitzSimmons, Lara)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Chris P. Galligan As Counsel for Proposed-Intervenor Sandoz Inc. Accordingly, Chris P. Galligan may enter an appearance for the purpose of representing intervenor-defendant Sandoz Inc. in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 20, 2020. (lcbah3)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Trang H. Lin As Counsel for Proposed-Intervenor Sandoz Inc. Accordingly, Trang H. Lin may enter an appearance for the purpose of representing intervenor-defendant Sandoz Inc. in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 20, 2020. (lcbah3)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachel P. Waldron As Counsel for Proposed-Intervenor Sandoz Inc. Accordingly, Rachel P. Waldron may enter an appearance for the purpose of representing intervenor-defendant Sandoz Inc. in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 20, 2020. (lcbah3)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lara E. FitzSimmons As Counsel for Proposed-Intervenor Sandoz Inc. Accordingly, Lara E. FitzSimmons may enter an appearance for the purpose of representing intervenor-defendant Sandoz Inc. in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 20, 2020. (lcbah3)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING #9 Unopposed Motion to Intervene by Sandoz, Inc. Accordingly, Sandoz Inc. may intervene as a defendant in this action, and shall abide by the April 9, 2020 Scheduling Order already in place. See Min. Order (Apr. 9, 2020). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 20, 2020. (lcbah3)
April 17, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Chris P. Galligan, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7034237. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SANDOZ INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rakoczy, William)
April 17, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Trang H. Lin, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7034227. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SANDOZ INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rakoczy, William)
April 17, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rachel P. Waldron, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7034215. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SANDOZ INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rakoczy, William)
April 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lara E. FitzSimmons, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7034167. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SANDOZ INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rakoczy, William)
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Rakoczy on behalf of SANDOZ INC. (Rakoczy, William)
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SANDOZ INC. (Rakoczy, William)
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Intervene by SANDOZ INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rakoczy, William)
April 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Certified copy of the administrative record due by 5/1/2020; summary Judgment motion due by 5/26/2020; cross-motion and opposition to motion for summary judgment due by 6/25/2020; opposition to cross-motion and reply to opposition to motion for summary judgment due by 7/9/2020; reply to opposition to cross-motion due by 7/23/2020; joint appendix due by 7/27/2020. (tg)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties' #7 Joint Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order, and ISSUING the following Scheduling Order to govern proceedings in this matter: (1) by May 1, 2020, the defendants shall serve a certified copy of the administrative record on the plaintiffs, as well as a certified list of the contents of the administrative record; (2) by May 26, 2020, the plaintiffs shall file any motion for summary judgment; (3) by June 25, 2020, the defendants shall file any cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to the plaintiffs' motion; (4) by July 9, 2020, the plaintiffs shall file any opposition to the defendants' cross-motion and reply in support of the plaintiffs' motion; (5) by July 23, 2020, the defendants shall file any reply in support of their cross-motion; (6) by July 27, 2020, the plaintiffs shall file a joint appendix in accordance with LCvR 7(n); and (7) if this case is not resolved on cross-motions for summary judgment, the defendants shall file an answer to the plaintiffs' #1 Complaint 21 days after the Court issues its summary-judgment ruling. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 9, 2020. (lcbah3)
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Defendants, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/30/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/25/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/24/2020.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jay, William)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order by TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jay, William)
April 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn A. Schmidt on behalf of All Defendants (Schmidt, Kathryn)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 25. 2020. (lcbah3)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, STEPHEN M. HAHN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
March 25, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb)
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Kim on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (Kim, Andrew)
March 24, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (Jay, William)
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II, STEPHEN M. HAHN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6951493) filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Jay, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al v. UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Kathryn A. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Kathryn A. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN M. HAHN
Represented By: Kathryn A. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Kathryn A. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.
Represented By: Andrew Kim
Represented By: William M. Jay
Represented By: Brian T Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: Andrew Kim
Represented By: William M. Jay
Represented By: Brian T Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: Christopher Marth
Represented By: Shannon M. Bloodworth
Represented By: Brandon Michael White
Represented By: David L. Anstaett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: SANDOZ INC.
Represented By: Lara E. FitzSimmons
Represented By: William A. Rakoczy
Represented By: Trang Lin
Represented By: Christopher Galligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?