FLORES SALGUERO v. EERKINS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: GERVIN FLORES SALGUERO
Defendant: NAEEM JAN, BILAAL AMIN JAN, EERKINS, INC. and EERKINS, INC. doing business as EERKINS UYGHUR CUISINE
Case Number: 1:2020cv00856
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to EERKINS, INC., BILAAL AMIN JAN, and NAEEM JAN. (ztth)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT by GERVIN FLORES SALGUERO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SCRA - Bilaal Jan, #2 Exhibit SCRA - Naeem Jan)(Tucker, Jonathan)
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Philip Tucker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tucker, Jonathan)
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BILAAL AMIN JAN served on 4/1/2020, answer due 4/22/2020 (Zelikovitz, Justin)
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NAEEM JAN served on 4/1/2020, answer due 4/22/2020 (Zelikovitz, Justin)
April 3, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EERKINS, INC. served on 4/1/2020, answer due 4/22/2020 (Zelikovitz, Justin)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to EERKINS, INC., BILAAL AMIN JAN, NAEEM JAN. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
March 31, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6973201) filed by GERVIN FLORES SALGUERO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (3))(Zelikovitz, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLORES SALGUERO v. EERKINS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAEEM JAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILAAL AMIN JAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EERKINS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EERKINS, INC. doing business as EERKINS UYGHUR CUISINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERVIN FLORES SALGUERO
Represented By: Justin Derek Zelikovitz
Represented By: Jonathan Philip Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?