GRACZYK, ET AL., v. VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., ET AL.,
Plaintiff: DON DAVIS, JERRY RIDDLE and RODNEY GRACZYK
Defendant: VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS INC., PS SPLICING, LLC and VERIZON SOURCING LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00889
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 118 JOINT STIPULATION TO WITHDRAW REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF FLSA SETTLEMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE by DON DAVIS, RODNEY GRACZYK, JERRY RIDDLE. (Cohen, David)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #116 Motion for Leave of Michael J. Salmanson to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/26/20. (DMK)
May 22, 2020 Filing 116 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael J. Salmanson, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7153668. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PS SPLICING, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Salmanson, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yaffe, Eric)
May 22, 2020 Filing 115 AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COLLECTIVE AND CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against PS SPLICING, LLC, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS INC., VERIZON SOURCING LLC with Jury Demand filed by RODNEY GRACZYK, JERRY RIDDLE, DON DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dycom Agmt, #2 Exhibit B - Danella Agmt, #3 Exhibit C - Universal Agmt, #4 Exhibit D - Adex Agmt, #5 Exhibit E - Precision Agmt, #6 Exhibit F - NX Agmt, #7 Exhibit G - Bluestream Agmt, #8 Exhibit H - Creamer Agmt, #9 Exhibit I - Verizon Sourcing Officers, #10 Exhibit J - 2018 VCI SEC 10-K, #11 Exhibit K - 2018 VCI Ann Report, #12 Exhibit L - VCI Code of Conduct)(Cohen, David)
May 21, 2020 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric L. Yaffe on behalf of PS SPLICING, LLC (Yaffe, Eric)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court will defer any further briefing or consideration of plaintiffs' motion to certify class #111 while defendant Verizon Communications Inc.'s motion to dismiss #112 is pending. Plaintiffs need not file a reply in support of their motion unless and until a schedule has been established by the Court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must submit any pleadings concerning the approval of the settlement between plaintiffs and defendant PS Splicing, LLC by June 2, 2020. See Local Civil Rule 5.1(a) ("correspondence shall not be directed by the parties or their attorneys to a judge"). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/19/2020. (lcabj2)
May 18, 2020 Filing 113 Memorandum in opposition to re #111 MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS RENEWED MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING NOTICE TO SIMILARLY-SITUATED EMPLOYEES UNDER 29 U.S.C. 216(b) AND D.C. CODE 32-1308(a)(1)(C) With Certificate of Service filed by VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Paula R. Harris, #2 Declaration Declaration of Michael Alfasi, #3 Declaration Declaration of William J. Ptak With Exhibit 1, #4 Declaration Declaration of Richard Kent Kildow With Exhibits A-B, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Costantino, Christine)
May 4, 2020 Filing 112 MOTION to Dismiss by VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Costantino, Christine)
May 4, 2020 Filing 111 MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS RENEWED MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING NOTICE TO SIMILARLY-SITUATED EMPLOYEES UNDER 29 U.S.C. 216(b) AND D.C. CODE 32-1308(a)(1)(C) by DON DAVIS, RODNEY GRACZYK, JERRY RIDDLE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A - Dycom Agmt, #4 Exhibit B - Danella Agmt, #5 Exhibit C - Universal Agmt, #6 Exhibit D - Adex Agmt, #7 Exhibit E - Precision Agmt, #8 Exhibit F - NX Agmt, #9 Exhibit G - Bluestream Agmt, #10 Exhibit H - Creamer Agmt, #11 Exhibit I - Graczyk Dec, #12 Exhibit J - Davis Dec, #13 Exhibit K - Riddle Dec, #14 Exhibit L - Donoghue Dec, #15 Exhibit M - Kicklighter Dec, #16 Exhibit N - Adams Dec, #17 Exhibit O - Barrett Dec, #18 Exhibit P - Proposed Notice, #19 Exhibit Q - Zouras Emails, #20 Exhibit R - Cohen Email, #21 Exhibit S - VCI Form 10-K, #22 Exhibit T - Vestberg Letter, #23 Exhibit U - Code of Conduct)(Cohen, David)
April 27, 2020 Filing 110 ERRATA by DON DAVIS, RODNEY GRACZYK, JERRY RIDDLE #109 Notice of Appearance filed by JERRY RIDDLE, RODNEY GRACZYK, DON DAVIS. (Cohen, David)
April 24, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #109 Notice of Appearance; emailed to dcohen@stephanzouras.com, cc'd 17 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Counsel must change their address via Pacer (zjf, )
April 24, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #108 Notice of Appearance; emailed to aficzko@stephanzouras.com, cc'd 17 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Counsel must change their address via Pacer (zjf, )
April 24, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #107 Notice of Appearance; emailed to jzouras@stephanzouras.com, cc'd 17 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Counsel must change their address via Pacer (zjf, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Cohen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cohen, David)
April 24, 2020 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C. Ficzko on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ficzko, Andrew)
April 24, 2020 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by James B. Zouras on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Zouras, James)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to #104 Andrew C. Ficzko, #105 David J. Cohen, and #106 James B. Zouras only upon condition that the lawyers admitted, or at least one member of the lawyers' firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/22/20. (DMK)
April 21, 2020 Filing 106 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- James B. Zouras, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7043309. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DON DAVIS, RODNEY GRACZYK, JERRY RIDDLE (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rathod, Jason)
April 21, 2020 Filing 105 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David J. Cohen, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7043295. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DON DAVIS, RODNEY GRACZYK, JERRY RIDDLE (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rathod, Jason)
April 21, 2020 Filing 104 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Andrew C. Ficzko, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7043029. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DON DAVIS, RODNEY GRACZYK, JERRY RIDDLE (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Andrew Ficzko, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rathod, Jason)
April 17, 2020 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Samuel Rathod on behalf of DON DAVIS, RODNEY GRACZYK, JERRY RIDDLE (Rathod, Jason)
April 17, 2020 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas A. Migliaccio on behalf of DON DAVIS, RODNEY GRACZYK, JERRY RIDDLE (Migliaccio, Nicholas)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #101 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Verizon Communications must answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint by May 6, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/8/2020. (lcabj2)
April 7, 2020 Filing 101 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Costantino, Christine)
April 2, 2020 Filing 100 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-06465. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 24, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Columbia.(js) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #68 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #73 Motion to Seal Document. For the reasons stated above, Defendant Verizon Communications' motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 68) is granted to the extent that this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Plaintiffs' motion to seal (Dkt. No. 73) is granted to the extent that Plaintiffs will re-file the Jeremiah Frei-Pearson declaration (Dkt. No. 44) with exhibits redacted consistent with the redactions in Verizon Communications' February 11, 2019 letter. Plaintiffs' motion to seal is otherwise denied, and Plaintiffs should re-file their brief opposing Verizon Communications' motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 75) without redactions. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Dkt. Nos. 68 and 73 and transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/24/2020) (js) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/3/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 97 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/3/2019 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jennifer Thun, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/4/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/16/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2020..(McGuirk, Kelly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
October 1, 2019 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/27/2019) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER terminating #41 Motion to Seal; denying without prejudice to renewal by formal motion #42 Motion; terminating #63 Motion to Seal. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' motion for an order authorizing the dissemination of court-authorized notice is denied without prejudice to re-filing after this Court has ruled on VCI's motion to dismiss. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion (Dkt. No. 42) and Plaintiffs' accompanying motions for leave to file their briefs under seal. (Dkt. Nos. 41, 63). (Dkt. No. 11). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/20/2019) (ne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 94 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Oslick, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER: denying #59 Letter Motion for Oral Argument; denying #77 Letter Motion for Oral Argument. The requests for Oral Argument are Denied. The Clerk will terminated the motions (Dkt. No. 59, 77). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/07/2019) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 92 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Michael J. Salmanson dated July 23, 2019 re: Response to Letter of Jacob Oslick dated July 18, 2019. Document filed by PS Splicing, LLC.(Salmanson, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 91 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jacob Oslick dated July 18, 2019 re: Certain Misleading Statements in Plaintiffs' July 15, 2019 Submission. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc..(Oslick, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 90 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jeremiah Frei-Pearson, David Cohen, James B. Zouras, and Michael J. Salmanson dated July 15, 2019 re: Reply re: Proposed PS Splicing Settlement. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle.(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #88 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. Replies due by 7/15/2019. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/8/2019) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 5, 2019 Filing 88 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jeremiah Frei-Pearson dated July 5, 2019. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle.(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 87 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jacob Oslick dated July 2, 2019 re: Proposed PS Splicing Settlement. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc..(Oslick, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 86 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jacob Oslick dated June 27, 2019 re: Fully-Submitted Motion Pending over 90 Days. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc..(Oslick, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #84 Letter filed by Verizon Communications, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 7/2/2019) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/21/2019) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 84 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jacob Oslick dated June 19, 2019 re: Plaintiffs' Letter Concerning Proposed PS Splicing Settlement. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc..(Oslick, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Joint Request for Approval of FLSA Settlement with PS Splicing, LLC. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agmt)(Cohen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 82 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jacob Oslick dated April 23, 2019 re: Opt-In Notice filed by Bernice Lowery (ECF #81). Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Oslick, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of Filing Consent Form. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form)(Zouras, James) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED as follows: 1. Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc.'s time to file and serve reply papers in further support of its motion to dismiss is extended three (3) days, until March 22, 2019. 2. This is the first requested extension of the reply deadline. It is made for good cause, to allow counsel sufficient time to prepare papers, and not to cause delay. 3. No other deadlines are affected by this request. SO ORDERED. (Replies due by 3/22/2019.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/4/2019) (kv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
April 2, 2019 Mediator Session Held on 4/1/19 at Plaintiff's Counsel's Office.(ah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 78 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jacob Oslick, Esq. dated March 22, 2019 re: Plaintiffs' motions to seal (ECF Nos. 41, 63, 73). Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc..(Oslick, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 77 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument on Verizon Communications Inc.'s motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jacob Oslick, Esq. dated March 22, 2019. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc..(Oslick, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 76 DECLARATION of David J. Cohen in Opposition re: #68 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #68 MOTION to Dismiss . (Partially Redacted). Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 74 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert S. Whitman, Esq. dated March 22, 2019 re: response to Plaintiffs' March 14, 2019 letter (ECF No. 66), regarding their equitable tolling arguments.. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc..(Whitman, Robert) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Partially Redacted). Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle.(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 72 DECLARATION of Michael Alfasi in Support re: #68 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Alfasi Decl. Ex. 1 - Amendment Number 11D)(Oslick, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 71 DECLARATION of Robert Whitman, Esq. in Support re: #68 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Oslick, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 70 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #68 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Oslick, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #68 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Oslick, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc..(Oslick, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 67 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Oslick, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 66 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jeremiah Frei-Pearson dated March 14, 2019 re: Supplemental Authority Concerning Plaintiffs Motion for Order Authorizing Notice. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Williams v. TSU Glob. Servs. Inc., #2 Exhibit Agonath v. Interstate Home Loans Ctr., Inc., #3 Exhibit Agarunova v. Stella Orton Home Care Agency, Inc)(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
March 6, 2019 MEDIATOR SESSION SCHEDULED First Mediation Session scheduled for 4/1/19, 10 A.M. at Plaintiff's Counsel's Office (Finkelstein, Blankinship, Frei-Pearson & Garber, LLP).(ah) Modified on 3/6/2019 (ah). [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 65 DECLARATION of Jeremiah Frei-Pearson in Support re: #42 MOTION for Order Authorizing Notice to Employees Under FLSA .. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 64 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #42 MOTION for Order Authorizing Notice to Employees Under FLSA . . Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION to Seal Plainitffs Reply in Support of Motion for FLSA Notice. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle.(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #60 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; granting #60 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 3/12/2019, Replies due by 3/19/2019.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/19/2019) (kv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
February 18, 2019 Filing 61 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert S. Whitman dated February 18, 2019 re: #60 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jeremiah Frei-Pearson dated February 18, 2019. LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jeremiah Frei-Pearson dated February 18, 2019. . Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Whitman, Robert) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
February 18, 2019 Filing 60 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jeremiah Frei-Pearson dated February 18, 2019., LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jeremiah Frei-Pearson dated February 18, 2019. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle.(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 59 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument on Motion for Conditional Certification and Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jacob Oslick dated February 11, 2019. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc..(Oslick, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Paula R. Harris in Opposition re: #42 MOTION for Order Authorizing Notice to Employees Under FLSA .. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Oslick, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Michael J. Alfasi in Opposition re: #42 MOTION for Order Authorizing Notice to Employees Under FLSA .. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Oslick, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Richard Kent Kildow in Opposition re: #42 MOTION for Order Authorizing Notice to Employees Under FLSA .. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Oslick, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 55 DECLARATION of William Ptak in Opposition re: #42 MOTION for Order Authorizing Notice to Employees Under FLSA .. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Oslick, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #42 MOTION for Order Authorizing Notice to Employees Under FLSA . WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Oslick, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacob FreemanMordecai Oslick on behalf of Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Oslick, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
January 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #52 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 52 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. Related Document Number: #42 . (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Terri Barrett in Support re: #42 MOTION for Order Authorizing Notice to Employees Under FLSA .. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Thomas Adams in Support re: #42 MOTION for Order Authorizing Notice to Employees Under FLSA .. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Robert Kicklighter in Support re: #42 MOTION for Order Authorizing Notice to Employees Under FLSA .. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Robert Donoghue in Support re: #42 MOTION for Order Authorizing Notice to Employees Under FLSA .. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Jerry Riddle in Support re: #42 MOTION for Order Authorizing Notice to Employees Under FLSA .. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Don Davis in Support re: #42 MOTION for Order Authorizing Notice to Employees Under FLSA .. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Rodney Graczyk in Support re: #42 MOTION for Order Authorizing Notice to Employees Under FLSA .. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Jeremiah Frei-Pearson in Support re: #42 MOTION for Order Authorizing Notice to Employees Under FLSA .. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through H (filed under seal), #2 Exhibit I -- Proposed Notice)(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #42 MOTION for Order Authorizing Notice to Employees Under FLSA . (redacted). Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Order Authorizing Notice to Employees Under FLSA . Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle.(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for FLSA Notice and Associated Exhibits. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle.(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
January 25, 2019 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 2/25/2019.(mf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 1/28/2019. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/16/2019) (mf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
January 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/3/2019. (Court Reporter Jennifer Thun / Lisa Smith) (mr) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference in this action previously scheduled for Thursday, January 3, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. is hereby rescheduled to take place on Thursday, January 3, 2019 at 12:30 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED., ( Initial Conference set for 1/3/2019 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/28/2018) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER, It is hereby ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference in this action previously scheduled for Thursday, December 13, 2018 is adjourned to Thursday, January 3, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 1/3/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/12/2018) (kv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 37 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert S. Whitman dated 11/7/2018 re: writing in response to Plaintiffs' letter (ECF No. 34) seeking a pre-motion conference in connection with an intended motion for conditional certification of an FLSA collective action.. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc..(Whitman, Robert) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Charles White on behalf of Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (White, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference in this action previously scheduled for November 8, 2018 is adjourned to Thursday, December 13, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Initial Conference set for 12/13/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/7/2018) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 34 LETTER MOTION for Conference respectfully request a pre-motion conference in connection with Plaintiffs anticipated motion for conditional certification of FLSA collective addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jeremiah Frei-Pearson dated November 2, 2018. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle.(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 33 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jeremiah Frei-Pearson, on behalf of all Counsel of Record dated November 1, 2018 re: Initial Case Management Conference. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Case Management Plan)(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 32 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David Cohen dated October 31, 2018 re: #31 LETTER MOTION for Conference respectfully request a pre-motion conference in connection with Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc. anticipated motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert S. Whitman dated October 26, 20 18. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 31 LETTER MOTION for Conference respectfully request a pre-motion conference in connection with Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc. anticipated motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert S. Whitman dated October 26, 2018. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc..(Whitman, Robert) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by PS Splicing, LLC.(Salmanson, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Application is granted. PS Splicing, LLC answer due 10/26/2018; Verizon Communications, Inc. answer due 10/26/2018. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/5/2018) (kgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Joseph Salmanson on behalf of PS Splicing, LLC. (Salmanson, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 27 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer from October 5, 2018 to October 26, 2018 addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert S. Whitman dated October 3, 2018. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc..(Whitman, Robert) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #20 Motion for David J. Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/31/2018) (cf) Modified on 11/7/2018 (cf). [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #24 Motion for Michael J. Salmanson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/31/18) (yv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
August 28, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #24 MOTION for Michael J. Salmanson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15501983. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Michael J. Salmanson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15501983. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by PS Splicing, LLC.(Goldshaw, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Defendant PS Splicing, LLC shall have until Friday, October 5, 2018 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint in the above captioned matter. SO ORDERED. (PS Splicing, LLC answer due 10/5/2018.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/23/2018) (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 22 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by PS Splicing, LLC. (Goldshaw, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. PS Splicing, LLC served on 8/9/2018, answer due 8/30/2018. Service was accepted by Sidney Towers. Document filed by Rodney Graczyk; Jerry Riddle; Don Davis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cohen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
August 17, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #20 MOTION for David J. Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15467059. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for David J. Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15467059. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David J. Cohen, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott B. Goldshaw on behalf of PS Splicing, LLC. (Goldshaw, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #11 Motion for James B. Zouras to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/9/2018) (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #12 Motion for Ryan F. Stephan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/9/2018) (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #13 Motion for Andrew Ficzko to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/9/2018) (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Verizon Communications, Inc.. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Verizon Communications, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 31, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Andrew C. Ficzko to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15385104. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Andrew C. Ficzko to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15385104. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andrew Ficzko, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ficzko, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 30, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Ryan F. Stephan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15384201. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Ryan F. Stephan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15384201. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ryan F. Stephan, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephan, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 30, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for James B. Zouras to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15384140. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for James B. Zouras to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15384140. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James B. Zouras, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Zouras, James) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to PS Splicing, LLC. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to PS Splicing, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 30, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jeremiah Lee Frei-Pearson to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; 'via' or 'c/o' must be listed before the second party name in the 'To:' section (for example: PS Splicing, LLC c/o Patsy W. Smith, Registered Agent). The wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; PS Splicing, LLC was previously issued a summons. If you require a new summons you must request an Amended Summons. Please include the word "Amended" on the summons request. 'As to' Error; a summons may only be requested 'as to' a defendant that is a party of record (PS Splicing, LLC). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PS Splicing, LLC, Patsy W. Smith, Registered Agent, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) Modified on 7/30/2018 (dnh). [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the Court for an initial pretrial conference in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on Thursday, November 8, 2018, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF(S) MUST: (i) IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL ATTORNEYS IN THIS ACTION BY SERVING UPON EACH OF THEM COPIES OF THIS NOTICE AND THE COURT'S INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES; AND (ii) SEND A COPY OF SUCH NOTICE TO CHAMBERS (without attachments). IF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF(S) IS UNAWARE OF THE IDENTITY OF COUNSEL FOR ANY OF THE PARTIES, COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF(S) MUST IMMEDIATELY SEND COPIES OF THE NOTICE AND INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES TO THAT PARTY PERSONALLY. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 11/8/2018 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/20/2018) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Verizon Communications, Inc.. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to PS Splicing, LLC. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 18, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 18, 2018 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 18, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeremiah Lee Frei-Pearson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Rodney Graczyk; Don Davis; Jerry Riddle. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PS Splicing, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Verizon Communications, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Don Davis, Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PS Splicing, LLC, Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15334627)Document filed by Rodney Graczyk, Jerry Riddle, Don Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Rodney Graczyk Opt-In Consent Form, #2 Exhibit B-Don Davis Opt-In Consent Form, #3 Exhibit C-Jerry Riddle Opt-In Consent Form)(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/2/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRACZYK, ET AL., v. VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., ET AL.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DON DAVIS
Represented By: Andrew C. White
Represented By: Andrew C. Ficzko
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: David J. Cohen
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Represented By: Jason Samuel Rathod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY RIDDLE
Represented By: Andrew C. White
Represented By: Andrew C. Ficzko
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: David J. Cohen
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Represented By: Jason Samuel Rathod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODNEY GRACZYK
Represented By: Andrew C. White
Represented By: Andrew C. Ficzko
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: David J. Cohen
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Represented By: Jason Samuel Rathod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS INC.
Represented By: Christine M. Costantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PS SPLICING, LLC
Represented By: Eric L. Yaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERIZON SOURCING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?