WILLIAMS et al v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
Plaintiff: RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT and THURMAN WILLIAMS
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MICHAEL CARVAJAL, QUINCY BOOTH and HOPE VILLAGE, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00890
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Referring Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Prison Condition (Other)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 92 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS (Metz, Kevin)
April 28, 2020 Filing 91 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by HOPE VILLAGE, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Henry, Jeanett)
April 27, 2020 Filing 90 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by HOPE VILLAGE, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Henry, Jeanett)
April 27, 2020 Filing 89 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Walker, Johnny)
April 26, 2020 Filing 88 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Walker, Johnny)
April 25, 2020 Filing 87 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Walker, Johnny)
April 24, 2020 Filing 86 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Walker, Johnny)
April 24, 2020 Filing 85 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by HOPE VILLAGE, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Henry, Jeanett)
April 24, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Telephone Conference held on 4/24/2020. Parties inform the court of the status of this action. Parties to submit status reports due by 5/1/2020. (Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins.) (tj)
April 23, 2020 Filing 84 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Walker, Johnny)
April 23, 2020 Filing 83 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by HOPE VILLAGE, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Henry, Jeanett)
April 22, 2020 Filing 82 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by HOPE VILLAGE, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Henry, Jeanett)
April 22, 2020 Filing 81 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Walker, Johnny)
April 21, 2020 Filing 80 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Walker, Johnny)
April 21, 2020 Filing 79 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by HOPE VILLAGE, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Henry, Jeanett)
April 20, 2020 Filing 78 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Walker, Johnny)
April 20, 2020 Filing 77 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by HOPE VILLAGE, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Henry, Jeanett)
April 19, 2020 Filing 76 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Walker, Johnny)
April 18, 2020 Filing 75 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Walker, Johnny)
April 17, 2020 Filing 74 TRANSCRIPT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION CONFERENCE before Judge Rudolph Contreras held on April 17, 2020; Page Numbers: 1-17. Date of Issuance: April 17, 2020. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/8/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2020.(Wayne, Bryan)
April 17, 2020 Filing 73 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Walker, Johnny)
April 17, 2020 Filing 72 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by HOPE VILLAGE, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Henry, Jeanett)
April 17, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Telephone Conference held on 4/17/2020. Emergency MOTION #42 to Compel Entry and Examination is WITHDRAWN as directed by the court, subject to refiling by plaintiffs. Materials for in-camera review shall be submitted to the court by April 20, 2020. Next Telephone Conference set for 4/24/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (Court Reporter: Bryan Wayne) (tj)
April 16, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Metz, Kevin)
April 16, 2020 Filing 70 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Walker, Johnny)
April 16, 2020 Filing 69 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by HOPE VILLAGE, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Henry, Jeanett)
April 16, 2020 Filing 68 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Walker, Johnny)
April 16, 2020 Filing 67 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to the BOP's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Jon Gustin (with exhibits))(Walker, Johnny)
April 16, 2020 Filing 66 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Defendant Hope Village Inc.'s Supplemental Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction) filed by HOPE VILLAGE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ittig, Kristen) Modified event title on 4/20/2020 (znmw).
April 16, 2020 Filing 65 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS re #63 Supplemental Memorandum, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3)(Metz, Kevin)
April 16, 2020 Filing 64 Memorandum in opposition to re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by QUINCY BOOTH, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1)(Bluming, Micah)
April 16, 2020 Filing 63 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (REDACTED) filed by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (REDACTED), #3 Exhibit 3 (REDACTED))(Metz, Kevin)
April 15, 2020 Filing 62 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Walker, Johnny)
April 15, 2020 Filing 61 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by HOPE VILLAGE, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Henry, Jeanett)
April 15, 2020 Filing 60 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and to Stay Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class by QUINCY BOOTH, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bluming, Micah). Added MOTION to Stay on 4/15/2020 (ztth).
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #60 Defendants' consent motion for extension of time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants the District and Hope Village shall respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by May 8, 2020, and Defendant the BOP shall respond to Plaintiffs' complaint by June 2, 2020. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' obligation to respond to #25 Plaintiffs' motion to certify class is STAYED pending further order of the Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 15, 2020. (lcrc3)
April 15, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: District of Columbia and Hope Village to respond to plaintiff's complaint by 5/8/2020; BOP shall respond to plaintiff's complaint by 6/2/2020. (tj)
April 14, 2020 Filing 59 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Walker, Johnny)
April 14, 2020 Filing 58 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by HOPE VILLAGE, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Henry, Jeanett)
April 14, 2020 Filing 57 REPLY to opposition to motion re #42 Emergency MOTION to Compel Entry and Examination filed by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS. (Metz, Kevin)
April 13, 2020 Filing 56 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by HOPE VILLAGE, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Henry, Jeanett)
April 13, 2020 Filing 55 RESPONSE re #42 Emergency MOTION to Compel Entry and Examination Defendant Hope Village, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery filed by HOPE VILLAGE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ittig, Kristen)
April 13, 2020 Filing 54 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Walker, Johnny)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PROTECTIVE ORDER: See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 13, 2020. (lcrc3)
April 13, 2020 Filing 52 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Rudolph Contreras, held on 04/07/2020. Page Numbers: 1-46. Date of Issuance: 04/13/2020. Court Reporter: Sara Wick, telephone number 202-354-3284. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. Afte r 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/4/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/12/2020.(Wick, Sara)
April 13, 2020 Filing 51 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny)
April 13, 2020 Filing 50 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by HOPE VILLAGE, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Henry, Jeanett)
April 13, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Briefing and to Reschedule Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Metz, Kevin). Added MOTION to Continue on 4/13/2020 (ztth).
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #49 Plaintiffs' uncontested motion for extension of time and to reschedule. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit any supplemental briefing on Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction by 11:00 AM on April 16, 2020. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the telephone hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction currently scheduled for Tuesday, April 14, 2020 at 11:00 AM is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for Friday, April 17, 2020 at 11:30 AM. Specific call-in instructions will follow via e-mail. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 13, 2020. (lcrc3)
April 13, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Motion for Preliminary Injuction due by 4/16/2020 at 11:00 AM. Telephone Conference reset for 4/17/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zcal)
April 12, 2020 Filing 48 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Walker, Johnny)
April 11, 2020 Filing 47 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Walker, Johnny)
April 11, 2020 Filing 46 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by HOPE VILLAGE, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Henry, Jeanett)
April 10, 2020 Filing 45 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Walker, Johnny)
April 10, 2020 Filing 44 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by HOPE VILLAGE, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Henry, Jeanett)
April 10, 2020 Filing 43 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Briefing by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Metz, Kevin)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #43 the parties' joint motion for extension of time to file supplemental briefing. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit any supplemental briefing on Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction by 11:00 AM on Monday, April 13, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 10, 2020. (lcrc3)
April 9, 2020 Filing 42 WITHDRAWN AS PER HEARING HELD ON 4/17/2020.........Emergency MOTION to Compel Entry and Examination by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Metz, Kevin). Added MOTION on 4/10/2020 (ztth).
April 9, 2020 Filing 41 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by HOPE VILLAGE, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Henry, Jeanett)
April 9, 2020 Filing 40 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Walker, Johnny)
April 9, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 4/13/2020. (tj)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Hope Village shall respond to #42 Plaintiffs' motion to compel by 5:00 PM on Monday, April 13, 2020. In the interim, it is FURTHER ORDERED that any individuals who seek to inspect the Hope Village facility shall inquire about (1) the process to obtain COVID-19 tests for themselves and (2) how to expeditiously avail themselves of any available resources for such testing. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 9, 2020. (lcrc3)
April 8, 2020 Filing 39 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Walker, Johnny)
April 8, 2020 Filing 38 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by HOPE VILLAGE, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Henry, Jeanett)
April 7, 2020 Filing 37 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Walker, Johnny)
April 7, 2020 Filing 36 REPLY to opposition to motion re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (ztth)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying #3 Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 7, 2020. (lcrc3)
April 7, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File Reply and Supplemental Affidavit by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Proposed Reply, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Proposed Reply, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Proposed Reply, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Proposed Reply, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Proposed Reply)(Metz, Kevin)
April 7, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Krevans Perloff on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Perloff, Michael)
April 7, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Motion Hearing held on 4/7/2020 re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by THURMAN WILLIAMS, RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT. Oral argument heard, and motion is DENIED for reasons stated on the record. Next Status Conference set for 4/14/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Rudolph Contreras. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Sara Wick.) (tj)
April 7, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #32 Notice of Appearance; emailed to pdisney@outtengolden.com, cc'd 28 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please update your address in PACER. (ztth, )
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #34 Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file reply and supplemental affidavit. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 7, 2020. (lcrc3)
April 6, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela A. Disney on behalf of QUINCY BOOTH, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Disney, Pamela)
April 6, 2020 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition by HOPE VILLAGE, INC. (Ittig, Kristen)
April 6, 2020 Filing 30 Memorandum in opposition to re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by HOPE VILLAGE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ittig, Kristen)
April 6, 2020 Filing 29 Memorandum in opposition to re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jon Gustin, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Walker, Johnny)
April 6, 2020 Filing 28 Memorandum in opposition to re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by QUINCY BOOTH, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bluming, Micah)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #31 Defendant's request for an extension of time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Hope Village is granted an extension of time to 5:10 PM Eastern Time to file its response. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 6, 2020. (lcrc3)
April 5, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Micah Ian Bluming on behalf of QUINCY BOOTH, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Bluming, Micah)
April 3, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Lyndsay Ayanna Niles on behalf of RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS (Niles, Lyndsay)
April 3, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Counsel by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin Metz, #2 Declaration of Emily Gunston, #3 Declaration of Scott Michelman, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Metz, Kevin). Added MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel on 4/6/2020 (ztth). Modified on 4/6/2020 (znmw).
April 3, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Saindon on behalf of QUINCY BOOTH, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Saindon, Andrew)
April 3, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Drew R. Wisniewski, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6987422. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LaForge, Clayton)
April 3, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanett P. Henry on behalf of HOPE VILLAGE, INC. (Henry, Jeanett)
April 3, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Yukins on behalf of HOPE VILLAGE, INC. (Yukins, Christopher)
April 3, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Elizabeth Ittig on behalf of HOPE VILLAGE, INC. (Ittig, Kristen)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: The Court notes that Drew R. Wisniewski is admitted to the District of Columbia Bar and maintains an office within the District of Columbia. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(c)(2) ("Practice by Non-Members of the Bar of this Court"), "[a]n attorney who engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia must be a member of... the Bar of this Court to file papers in this Court." Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.8(a), attorneys who are active members in good standing of the District of Columbia Bar may petition the Clerk for admission to the bar of this court. Mr. Wisniewski may submit his application to the Clerk in advance of the Court's scheduled hearing, and, if he seeks to speak at the hearing, he may make a request then and state that the application is pending, but he has not yet been sworn in. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 3, 2020. (lcrc3)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Plaintiffs' emergency motion to shorten Defendants' time in which to respond to Plaintiffs' application for a temporary restraining order. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiffs' motion by 5:00 PM on Monday, April 6. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 3, 2020. (lcrc3)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #7 Plaintiffs' motion for a hearing, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court by telephone for a hearing on April 7, 2020, at 12:00 p.m. Specific call-in instructions will follow via e-mail. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 3, 2020. (lcrc3)
April 3, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/7/2020 at 12:00 PM before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (tj)
April 3, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 4/6/2020 (tj)
April 2, 2020 Filing 22 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case as deemed not related. (ztnr)
April 2, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Michelman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Michelman, Scott)
April 2, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spitzer, Arthur)
April 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Walker, Johnny)
April 2, 2020 Filing 15 ERRATA to Corrected Request for A TRO Hearing on or before the Morning of Monday, April 6, 2020 by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS re #7 MOTION for Hearing (Metz, Kevin) Modified on 4/3/2020 (ztth).
April 2, 2020 Filing 14 ERRATA to Corrected Emergency Motion to Shorten Defendants' Time in which to Respond to Plaintiffs' Temporary Restraining Order Motion by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS re #6 Emergency MOTION to Shorten Defendants Time in which to Respond to Plaintiffs Temporary Restraining Order Motion (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Metz, Kevin); Modified text on 4/3/2020 (ztth).
April 2, 2020 Filing 13 ERRATA to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS re #5 Memorandum,, (Metz, Kevin); Modified text on 4/3/2020 (ztth).
April 2, 2020 Filing 12 ERRATA of Corrected Motion for Preliminary Injunction by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Metz, Kevin) Modified event on 4/3/2020 (ztd).
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 ERRATA of Corrected Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Corrected Certificate of Counsel Pursuant to LCvR 65.1(a), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Metz, Kevin) Modified event on 4/3/2020 (ztd).
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to QUINCY BOOTH, MICHAEL CARVAJAL, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, HOPE VILLAGE, INC., U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General, and District of Columbia Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corrected Complaint by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS re #1 Complaint,, (Metz, Kevin)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Clayton D. LaForge on behalf of RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS (LaForge, Clayton)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION For Hearing (Request for A TRO Hearing on or before the Morning of Monday, April 6, 2020) by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Metz, Kevin) Modified on 4/2/2020 to correct event (zsb).
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION to Shorten Defendants Time in which to Respond to Plaintiffs Temporary Restraining Order Motion by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Metz, Kevin) Modified event on 4/3/2020 (znmw).
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by THURMAN WILLIAMS, RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by THURMAN WILLIAMS, RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Dr. Jonathan Giftos, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Mr. Thurman Williams, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Mr. Ronald Ian Boatright, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Mr. Anthony Antonio Pleasant)(Metz, Kevin)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED ON 4/16/2020.....MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Metz, Kevin); Modified on 4/17/2020 (ztth).
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Counsel Pursuant to LCvR 65.1(a), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Metz, Kevin)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT, THURMAN WILLIAMS. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-849. (Metz, Kevin)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against QUINCY BOOTH, MICHAEL CARVAJAL, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, HOPE VILLAGE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6983173) filed by THURMAN WILLIAMS, RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Summons to the Federal Bureau of Prisons, #2 Summons to Michael Carvajal, #3 Summons to the District of Columbia, #4 Summons to Quincy Booth, #5 Summons to Hope Village. Inc., #6 Summons to the U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, #7 Summons for U.S. Attorney General, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Metz, Kevin)
April 2, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS et al v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD IAN BOATRIGHT
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Kevin H. Metz
Represented By: Clayton D. LaForge
Represented By: Scott Michelman
Represented By: Michael Krevans Perloff
Represented By: Lyndsay Ayanna Niles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THURMAN WILLIAMS
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Kevin H. Metz
Represented By: Clayton D. LaForge
Represented By: Scott Michelman
Represented By: Michael Krevans Perloff
Represented By: Lyndsay Ayanna Niles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Pamela A. Disney
Represented By: Micah Ian Bluming
Represented By: Andrew J. Saindon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL CARVAJAL
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUINCY BOOTH
Represented By: Pamela A. Disney
Represented By: Micah Ian Bluming
Represented By: Andrew J. Saindon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOPE VILLAGE, INC.
Represented By: Christopher R. Yukins
Represented By: Kristen Elizabeth Ittig
Represented By: Jeanett P. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?