MORTGAGE BANKERS ASSOCIATION v. METROTEX ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, INC.
Plaintiff: MORTGAGE BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Defendant: Metrotex Association of Realtors, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00918
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 05/05/2020. (lcrjl3)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent and/or trademark. (znmw)
April 8, 2020 SUMMONS Not Issued as to METROTEX ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, INC. (adh, )
April 8, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (adh, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6995933) filed by MORTGAGE BANKERS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Parry, Thomas) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORTGAGE BANKERS ASSOCIATION v. METROTEX ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metrotex Association of Realtors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MORTGAGE BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Thomas Mathews Parry, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?