MOUNT SINAI HOSPITAL et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: SAINT PETERS UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC., MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC., SAINT BARNABAS MEDICAL CENTER, CLARA MAASS MEDICAL CENTER, JERSEY CITY MEDICAL CENTER, THE MOUNT SINAI HOSPITAL, UNITED HEALTH SERVICES HOSPITALS, INC., NEWARK BETH ISRAEL MEDICAL CENTER, RWJ BARNABAS HEALTH, INC., MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER SOUTHERN CAMPUS, MOUNT SINAI HOSPITAL, SAINT PETER'S UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC., RWJ BARNABAS HEALTH, INC. formerly known as LIBERTY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. formerly doing business as GREENVILLE HOSPITAL, RWJ BARNABAS HEALTH, INC. formerly known as LIBERTY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. formerly known as LIBERTY RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE, INC. formerly doing business as MEADOWLANDS HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, LIBERTY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., LIBERTY RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE, INC., UNITED HEALTH SERVICES HOSPITALS, INC. doing business as UHS HOSPITALS and KIMBALL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv00978
Filed: April 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings and Vacate Deadline to Respond to Complaint. It is ORDERED that the deadline for defendant to respond to the complaint is vacated and this case shall be stayed pending consolidation or further action on the Notice of Related Case. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/22/20. (DMK)
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings, Consent MOTION to Vacate Deadline to Respond to Complaint by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALEX M. AZAR, II. Case related to Case No. 19-mc-00190. (Bryce, Peter)
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Bryce on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Bryce, Peter)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 4/17/2020 (Jacob, John)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/20/2020. (Jacob, John)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/16/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/15/2020. (Jacob, John)
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
April 15, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb)
April 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by THE MOUNT SINAI HOSPITAL. Case related to Case No. 19-mc-190. (Jacob, John)
April 14, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by THE MOUNT SINAI HOSPITAL (Jacob, John)
April 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7021884) filed by THE MOUNT SINAI HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Jacob, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOUNT SINAI HOSPITAL et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Peter M. Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT PETERS UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: John Robert Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT BARNABAS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: John Robert Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARA MAASS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: John Robert Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERSEY CITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: John Robert Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE MOUNT SINAI HOSPITAL
Represented By: John Robert Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED HEALTH SERVICES HOSPITALS, INC.
Represented By: John Robert Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEWARK BETH ISRAEL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: John Robert Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RWJ BARNABAS HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: John Robert Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER SOUTHERN CAMPUS
Represented By: John Robert Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOUNT SINAI HOSPITAL
Represented By: John Robert Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT PETER'S UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: John Robert Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RWJ BARNABAS HEALTH, INC. formerly known as LIBERTY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. formerly doing business as GREENVILLE HOSPITAL
Represented By: John Robert Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RWJ BARNABAS HEALTH, INC. formerly known as LIBERTY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. formerly known as LIBERTY RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE, INC. formerly doing business as MEADOWLANDS HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: John Robert Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIBERTY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: John Robert Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIBERTY RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE, INC.
Represented By: John Robert Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED HEALTH SERVICES HOSPITALS, INC. doing business as UHS HOSPITALS
Represented By: John Robert Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBALL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: John Robert Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?