ORJI v. BARR et al
Petitioner: MICHAEL A. ORJI
Respondent: JOHN DOE, MARTHA DOE, CATRICIA HOWARD and WILLIAM P. BARR
Case Number: 1:2020cv01004
Filed: April 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Referring Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) STRIKING #5 Standing Order from the docket; DIRECTING the Clerk to post the petitioner's #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus in his related criminal case, United States v. Orgi, 1:18-cr-00068-BAH; and NOTIFYING the parties that all documents should be filed in the aforementioned criminal docket, 1:18-cr-00068-BAH. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 28, 2020. (lcbah3)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 Case directly reassigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell as related. Judge Emmet G. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 4/28/2020.....STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/20/20. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) Modified on 4/29/2020 (znmw).
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:20-cv-00614. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on April 14, 2020. (kjn) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 4/17/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 4/17/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $5, Receipt Number 333), filed by Michael A. Orji.(lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 4/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ORJI v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MARTHA DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CATRICIA HOWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICHAEL A. ORJI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?