LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY v. FAIRCLOTH JR et al
Plaintiff: LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: CRC TRANSPORT LLC, STATE WIDE TRANSPORTATION INC, APEX CAPITAL CORP, HEAVY HAUL SOLUTIONS LLC, ANDY & SONS AUTOTRANS INC., UMBRELLA AUTO TRANSPORT INC, DYLAN EXPRESS CORP, PORTER BILLING SERVICES, TAURUS AUTO GROUP INC, LONGMILE AUTO HAUL INC, CONTINENTAL TRANSPORT EXPRESS LLC, RGV AUTO TRANSPORT INC, ABS AUTO CARRIERS, LLC, S&S USED AUTO SALES LLC, NATIONAL SPECIALTY CONTRACTING, LLC, ACCUTRAC CAPITAL, ID TRANSPORT INC, EXPRESS FREIGHT FINANCE, DIESEL AUTO EXPRESS LLC, BIBBY TRANSPORTATION FINANCE, PHOENIX CAPITAL GROUP, INROAD AUTOMOBILE INC, ONLY WAY LLC, WINFREE TRANSPORTATION LLC, CAPITAL CREDIT, TRACY FAIRCLOTH, DEALER LOGISTICS LLC, MUELLER AUTOMOBILE TRANSPORT LLC, COMER'S CAR-GO LLC, INTEGRA FUNDING SOLUTIONS, VALTER & SONS LLC, EAST LINES GROUP LLC, FIRST BANK & TRUST, HIGH END AUTO TRANSPORT LLC, LNR LOGISTICS, LLC, HAPPY AUTO TRANSPORT CORP, MOORE & MORE TRANSPORT LLC, MIKE MOVE MOTORS LLC, PAPER IMPEX USA INC, US AUTO TRANSPORT INC, KEEP IT MOVIN TRANSPORT LLC, UNITED EAGLE INC, RND TRANSPORT LLC, DIOR MOVE MOTORS LLC, T&M TRUCKING LLC, DRIVEN UNLIMITED LLC, FAST CRAFT TRANSPORTATION LLC, OTR CAPITAL, OK TRANS LLC, FIELDS & FIELDS TRANSPORT LLC, EASTSIDE CARS LLC, COASTAL AUTO TRANSPORT LLC, MONWAY EXPRESS LLC, JOHN LARRY YODER, Z PROMOTION LLC, ANS TRANSPORT LLC, UPSTATE AUTO HAUL LLC, ACE TRUCK & TRAILER LLC, ARARAT TRANSPORTATION INC., EXPEDITE LOGISTICS INC., DK EXPRESS INC., CLAUDIA AUTO TRANSPORT LLC, AMERICAN AUTO TRANSPORT INC., WHITE HAWKS AUTO LLC, CODY MORROW D/B/A MORROW TRANSPORT, EASY AUTO TRANSPORT INC., 5 STAR SOUTH AUTO TRANSPORT, INC., GREAT SILK RD TRANSPORTATION INC, JANA TRANSPORTATION INC, AY TRUCKING INC., TBS FACTORING SERVICE LLC, MC TRANSPORTATION LLC, BAD BOY TRANSPORT INC., SELECT AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC, STEARNY TRANSPORT LLC, FBI EXPRESS INC., LAMIL DIESEL SERVICES, ALWAYS AUTO TRANSPORT LLC, COREFUND CAPITAL, 2ND CHANCE TRANSPORT, INC., SCOTT JOHN SANCHEZ, TAYLOR AUTO TRANSPORT INC, MCDUFFIE AUTO TRANSPORT INC, WEX BANK, VOLTURN LLC, G & R HEAVY HAULIN CORP, ATGT TRANSPORTATION LLC, ORGIL AUTO INC, DANIEL H FAIRCLOTH JR, TBS FACTORING SERVICE, LLC, FIRST BANK & TRUST ASSIGNEE OF UNITED EAGLE INC doing business as FIRSTLINE FUNDING GROUP, CAPITAL CREDIT ASSIGNEE OF SCOTT JOHN SANCHEZ doing business as SANCHEZ AUTO TRANSPORT, NATIONAL SPECIALTY CONTRACTING, LLC doing business as NATIONAL, FIRST BANK & TRUST ASSIGNEE OF EAST LINES GROUP LLC doing business as FIRSTLINE FUNDING GROUP, MUELLER AUTOMOBILE TRANSPORT LLC doing business as SUPERTRANSPORT, SCOTT JOHN SANCHEZ doing business as SANCHEZ AUTO TRANSPORT, JOHN LARRY YODER doing business as JOHN L EXPRESS and S&S USED AUTO SALES LLC doing business as S&S AUTO TRANSPORT
Case Number: 1:2020cv01057
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE. Z PROMOTION LLC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 19, 2020 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE. WHITE HAWKS AUTO LLC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 19, 2020 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE. US AUTO TRANSPORT INC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 19, 2020 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE. PORTER BILLING SERVICES(ASSIGNEE OF UPSTATE AUTO HALL LLC) waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020; UPSTATE AUTO HAUL LLC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 19, 2020 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE. TAYLOR AUTO TRANSPORT INC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 19, 2020 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE. STEARNY TRANSPORT LLC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 19, 2020 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE. STATE WIDE TRANSPORTATION INC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 19, 2020 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE. S&S USED AUTO SALES LLC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 19, 2020 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE. RND TRANSPORT LLC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 19, 2020 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE. RGV AUTO TRANSPORT INC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 19, 2020 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE. PAPER IMPEX USA INC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 19, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ONLY WAY LLC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020; PHOENIX CAPITAL GROUP waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 19, 2020 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE. OK TRANS LLC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 19, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE. MUELLER AUTOMOBILE TRANSPORT LLC waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/3/2020. (Husk, John)
June 19, 2020 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE. JOHN LARRY YODER waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 19, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE. INROAD AUTOMOBILE INC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 19, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE. G & R HEAVY HAULIN CORP waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 19, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE. FAST CRAFT TRANSPORTATION LLC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 19, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE. DYLAN EXPRESS CORP waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 18, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE. DRIVEN UNLIMITED LLC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 18, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE. DIESEL AUTO EXPRESS LLC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 18, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE. DEALER LOGISTICS LLC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 18, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE. COREFUND CAPITAL( ASSIGNEE OF DIOR MOVE MOTORS LLC) waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020; DIOR MOVE MOTORS LLC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 18, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE. CONTINENTAL TRANSPORT EXPRESS LLC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 18, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE. COMER'S CAR-GO LLC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 18, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE. COASTAL AUTO TRANSPORT LLC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020; WEX BANK( ASSIGNEE OF COASTAL AUTO TRANSPORT LLC) waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE. AY TRUCKING INC. waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ATGT TRANSPORTATION LLC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ARARAT TRANSPORTATION INC. waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ANS TRANSPORT LLC waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Husk, John)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Volturn LLC (Husk, John)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Porter Billing Services, LLC, assignee of Lamil Diesel Services, LLC, Upstate Auto Hall LLC and Driven Unlimited LLC by LAMIL DIESEL SERVICES, PORTER BILLING SERVICES(ASSIGNEE OF UPSTATE AUTO HALL LLC), PORTER BILLING SERVICES(ASSIGNEE OF DRIVEN UNLIMITED LLC).(Schumm, Brooke)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Lamil Diesel Services, Inc. (Husk, John)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by LAMIL DIESEL SERVICES. "Leave to file GRANTED" signed by Judge Amy B. Jackson on 06/02/2020 (zjf)
May 28, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #3 Suggestion of Bankruptcy was entered in error as to counsel not admitted to practice in the District Court for DC. (zjf)
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by LAMIL DIESEL SERVICES. (zjf) Modified on 5/28/2020 (zjf).
April 23, 2020 SUMMONS Not Issued as to All Defendants. (adh, ) Modified on 5/1/2020 (znmw).
April 23, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA correcting Electronic Signature by LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY #1 Complaint, filed by LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Husk, John)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader, Indemnity, and Posting of Collateral against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7047562) filed by LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-Indemnity Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Husk, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY v. FAIRCLOTH JR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRC TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE WIDE TRANSPORTATION INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APEX CAPITAL CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEAVY HAUL SOLUTIONS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDY & SONS AUTOTRANS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMBRELLA AUTO TRANSPORT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DYLAN EXPRESS CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTER BILLING SERVICES
Represented By: Brooke Schumm, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAURUS AUTO GROUP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LONGMILE AUTO HAUL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTINENTAL TRANSPORT EXPRESS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RGV AUTO TRANSPORT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABS AUTO CARRIERS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&S USED AUTO SALES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL SPECIALTY CONTRACTING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACCUTRAC CAPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ID TRANSPORT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPRESS FREIGHT FINANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIESEL AUTO EXPRESS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIBBY TRANSPORTATION FINANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHOENIX CAPITAL GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INROAD AUTOMOBILE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONLY WAY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WINFREE TRANSPORTATION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL CREDIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY FAIRCLOTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEALER LOGISTICS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUELLER AUTOMOBILE TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMER'S CAR-GO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTEGRA FUNDING SOLUTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALTER & SONS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAST LINES GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST BANK & TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGH END AUTO TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LNR LOGISTICS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAPPY AUTO TRANSPORT CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOORE & MORE TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE MOVE MOTORS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAPER IMPEX USA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US AUTO TRANSPORT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEEP IT MOVIN TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED EAGLE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RND TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIOR MOVE MOTORS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T&M TRUCKING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRIVEN UNLIMITED LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAST CRAFT TRANSPORTATION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTR CAPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OK TRANS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIELDS & FIELDS TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EASTSIDE CARS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COASTAL AUTO TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONWAY EXPRESS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN LARRY YODER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z PROMOTION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANS TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPSTATE AUTO HAUL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE TRUCK & TRAILER LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARARAT TRANSPORTATION INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPEDITE LOGISTICS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DK EXPRESS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAUDIA AUTO TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN AUTO TRANSPORT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHITE HAWKS AUTO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CODY MORROW D/B/A MORROW TRANSPORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EASY AUTO TRANSPORT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5 STAR SOUTH AUTO TRANSPORT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREAT SILK RD TRANSPORTATION INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANA TRANSPORTATION INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AY TRUCKING INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBS FACTORING SERVICE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MC TRANSPORTATION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAD BOY TRANSPORT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECT AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEARNY TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI EXPRESS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAMIL DIESEL SERVICES
Represented By: Brooke Schumm, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALWAYS AUTO TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COREFUND CAPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2ND CHANCE TRANSPORT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT JOHN SANCHEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAYLOR AUTO TRANSPORT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCDUFFIE AUTO TRANSPORT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEX BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VOLTURN LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G & R HEAVY HAULIN CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATGT TRANSPORTATION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORGIL AUTO INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL H FAIRCLOTH JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBS FACTORING SERVICE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST BANK & TRUST ASSIGNEE OF UNITED EAGLE INC doing business as FIRSTLINE FUNDING GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL CREDIT ASSIGNEE OF SCOTT JOHN SANCHEZ doing business as SANCHEZ AUTO TRANSPORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL SPECIALTY CONTRACTING, LLC doing business as NATIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST BANK & TRUST ASSIGNEE OF EAST LINES GROUP LLC doing business as FIRSTLINE FUNDING GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUELLER AUTOMOBILE TRANSPORT LLC doing business as SUPERTRANSPORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT JOHN SANCHEZ doing business as SANCHEZ AUTO TRANSPORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN LARRY YODER doing business as JOHN L EXPRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&S USED AUTO SALES LLC doing business as S&S AUTO TRANSPORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: John T. Husk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?