CHEYENNE RIVER SIOUX TRIBE et al v. MNUCHIN
Plaintiff: ROSEBUD SIOUX TRIBE, CHEYENNE RIVER SIOUX TRIBE and OGLALA SIOUX TRIBE
Defendant: STEVEN MNUCHIN
Case Number: 1:2020cv01059
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Bear Eagle on behalf of OGLALA SIOUX TRIBE (Bear Eagle, Jennifer)
April 27, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C. Lynch on behalf of STEVEN MNUCHIN (Lynch, Jason)
April 26, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by ARTIC VILLAGE COUNCIL, CHEYENNE RIVER SIOUX TRIBE, NATIVE VILLAGE OF VENETIE TRIBAL GOVERNMENT, NONDALTON TRIBAL COUNCIL, OGLALA SIOUX TRIBE, ROSEBUD SIOUX TRIBE. (Ducheneaux, Nicole)
April 24, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to opposition to motion re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ARTIC VILLAGE COUNCIL, CHEYENNE RIVER SIOUX TRIBE, NATIVE VILLAGE OF VENETIE TRIBAL GOVERNMENT, NONDALTON TRIBAL COUNCIL, OGLALA SIOUX TRIBE, ROSEBUD SIOUX TRIBE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Ducheneaux, Nicole)
April 24, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against STEVEN MNUCHIN filed by CHEYENNE RIVER SIOUX TRIBE, ROSEBUD SIOUX TRIBE, OGLALA SIOUX TRIBE.(Ducheneaux, Nicole)
April 24, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Rachel Condon on behalf of ROSEBUD SIOUX TRIBE (Condon, Megan)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jennifer Bear Eagle is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/24/2020. (lcapm2)
April 23, 2020 Cases Consolidated. Case 20-1059 has been consolidated with 20-1002 pursuant to Minute Order entered 04/23/2020. ALL PLEADINGS MUST BE FILED IN LEAD CASE NO. 20-1002. THE PARTIES ARE ADVISED NOT TO ELECT TO SPREAD TEXT WHEN FILING IN ECF. (eg)
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jennifer Bear Eagle, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7053623. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CHEYENNE RIVER SIOUX TRIBE, OGLALA SIOUX TRIBE, ROSEBUD SIOUX TRIBE (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ducheneaux, Nicole)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Because this matter involves common questions of law and fact as Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation v. Mnuchin, 20-cv-1002, the court on its own motion consolidates this case with the Confederated Tribes action. Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a). The same scheduling order entered in the Confederated Tribes action shall apply to the motion for injunctive relief pending in this case, and Defendant may file a consolidated opposition to both motions for injunctive relief. The Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe Plaintiffs shall file their reply by noon on April 24, 2020, on the Confederated Tribes docket. A hearing on the Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe Plaintiffs' motion shall be consolidated with the hearing on the Confederated Tribes' motion. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/23/2020. (lcapm2)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, ECF Nos. #8 , #9 , and #10 . Erin C. Dougherty Lynch, Matthew N. Newman, and Megan R. Condon are hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff Rosebud Sioux Tribe. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/23/2020. (lcapm2)
April 23, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to STEVEN MNUCHIN. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
April 23, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (adh, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Megan R. Condon, on behalf of Rosebud Sioux Tribe Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7049929. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROSEBUD SIOUX TRIBE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Condon, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice)(Furlong, Wesley)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew N. Newman, on behalf of Rosebud Sioux Tribe Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7049921. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROSEBUD SIOUX TRIBE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Newman, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice)(Furlong, Wesley)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Erin C. Dougherty Lynch, on behalf of Rosebud Sioux Tribe Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7049916. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROSEBUD SIOUX TRIBE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lynch Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice)(Furlong, Wesley)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie A. Landreth on behalf of ROSEBUD SIOUX TRIBE (Landreth, Natalie)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley James Furlong on behalf of ROSEBUD SIOUX TRIBE (Furlong, Wesley)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by CHEYENNE RIVER SIOUX TRIBE, OGLALA SIOUX TRIBE, ROSEBUD SIOUX TRIBE (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ducheneaux, Nicole)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by CHEYENNE RIVER SIOUX TRIBE, OGLALA SIOUX TRIBE, ROSEBUD SIOUX TRIBE (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Ducheneaux, Nicole)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 ERRATA by CHEYENNE RIVER SIOUX TRIBE, OGLALA SIOUX TRIBE, ROSEBUD SIOUX TRIBE. (Ducheneaux, Nicole)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CHEYENNE RIVER SIOUX TRIBE, OGLALA SIOUX TRIBE, ROSEBUD SIOUX TRIBE. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-01002. (Ducheneaux, Nicole)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STEVEN MNUCHIN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7048357) filed by CHEYENNE RIVER SIOUX TRIBE, ROSEBUD SIOUX TRIBE, OGLALA SIOUX TRIBE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ducheneaux, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHEYENNE RIVER SIOUX TRIBE et al v. MNUCHIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN MNUCHIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSEBUD SIOUX TRIBE
Represented By: Natalie A. Landreth
Represented By: Wesley James Furlong
Represented By: Nicole E. Ducheneaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHEYENNE RIVER SIOUX TRIBE
Represented By: Nicole E. Ducheneaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OGLALA SIOUX TRIBE
Represented By: Nicole E. Ducheneaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?