TRAMMO, INC. et al v. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: TRAMMO, INC., TRANSRAIL, INC. and TRANSAMMONIA, INC.
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY and UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01079
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey Bryan on behalf of UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO. (Bryan, Kelsey)
June 11, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Majoras on behalf of UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO. (Majoras, John)
June 11, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Swathi Bojedla on behalf of TRAMMO, INC., TRANSRAIL, INC. (Bojedla, Swathi)
June 8, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Fanchiang on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Fanchiang, Eric)
June 8, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Alan Gardiner on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Gardiner, Kent)
June 8, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Mara Lieber on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Lieber, Mara)
June 8, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Luke P. van Houwelingen on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (van Houwelingen, Luke)
June 5, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY.(Reinhart, Tara)
June 5, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Trammo, Inc.) by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC..(Arteaga, Juan)
June 5, 2020 Filing 17 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (Trammo, Inc. ) by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Arteaga, Juan)
June 5, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY.(Stein, Linda)
June 5, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO..(Childress, Tyrone)
June 5, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyrone R. Childress on behalf of UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO. (Childress, Tyrone)
June 3, 2020 Filing 13 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda)
June 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Bruder Fox on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Fox, Molly)
June 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Sue Stein on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda)
May 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Halli Spraggins on behalf of TRAMMO, INC., TRANSRAIL, INC. (Spraggins, Halli)
May 12, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE. CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. waiver sent on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/27/2020. (Gosselin, Sathya)
May 12, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY waiver sent on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/27/2020. (Gosselin, Sathya)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE. UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO. waiver sent on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/27/2020. (Gosselin, Sathya)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY waiver sent on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/27/2020. (Gosselin, Sathya)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
April 27, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by TRAMMO, INC., TRANSRAIL, INC.. Case related to Case No. 1:20-mc-00008. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Gosselin, Sathya)
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TRANSRAIL, INC. (Gosselin, Sathya)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TRAMMO, INC. (Gosselin, Sathya)
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7058420) filed by TRAMMO, INC., TRANSRAIL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to BNSF Railway, #3 Summons as to CSX Transportation, #4 Summons as to Norfolk Southern, #5 Summons as to Union Pacific)(Gosselin, Sathya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRAMMO, INC. et al v. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAMMO, INC.
Represented By: Sathya S. Gosselin
Represented By: Swathi Bojedla
Represented By: Halli Emmanuelle Spraggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRANSRAIL, INC.
Represented By: Sathya S. Gosselin
Represented By: Swathi Bojedla
Represented By: Halli Emmanuelle Spraggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRANSAMMONIA, INC.
Represented By: Sathya S. Gosselin
Represented By: Swathi Bojedla
Represented By: Halli Emmanuelle Spraggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: Juan Arteaga
Represented By: Luke P. van Houwelingen
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Represented By: Mara Lieber
Represented By: Eric Fanchiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Linda Sue Stein
Represented By: Molly Bruder Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Tara L. Reinhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO.
Represented By: Tyrone R. Childress
Represented By: Kelsey Bryan
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?