BEYOND PESTICIDES v. TRUGREEN LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Plaintiff: BEYOND PESTICIDES
Defendant: TRUGREEN LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Case Number: 1:2020cv01083
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 6/30/2020; Reply due by 7/21/2020. (jth)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting Consent #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Deadlines. TruGreen's opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand shall be filed by June 30, 2020. Plaintiff's reply in further support of its Motion to Remand shall be filed by July 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/19/2020. (DJS)
June 19, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees by TRUGREEN LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Folds, J.)
June 3, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response. due by 6/23/2020. Reply due by 7/14/2020. (tb)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Deadlines. TruGreen's opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand shall be filed by June 23, 2020. Plaintiff's reply in further support of its Remand Motion shall be filed by July 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/2/2020. (DJS)
June 2, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees by TRUGREEN LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Folds, J.)
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by BEYOND PESTICIDES (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand and for Fees and Costs, #2 Declaration of Kim E. Richman, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Richman, Kim). Added MOTION for Attorney Fees on 5/27/2020 (ztd).
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 Receipt on Superior Court for the District of Columbia of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2020 CA 1973 B. (ztd)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting Defendant's unopposed Motion #6 for extension of time to answer. Defendant's obligation to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby STAYED pending further order of the court. SO ORDERED by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 04/29/2020. (tb)
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by TRUGREEN LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Folds, J.)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by J. David Folds on behalf of TRUGREEN LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Folds, J.)
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (adh, )
April 27, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (adh, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 ERRATA Correcting Caption on Notice of Removal by TRUGREEN LIMITED PARTNERSHIP #1 Notice of Removal, filed by TRUGREEN LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Notice of Removal)(Folds, J.)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TRUGREEN LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Folds, J.)
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2020 CA 001973 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-7058966 filed by TRUGREEN LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Folds, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEYOND PESTICIDES v. TRUGREEN LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEYOND PESTICIDES
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRUGREEN LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: J. David Folds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?