BOBKA v. WARDEN et al
Petitioner: MICHAEL BOBKA
Respondent: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MICHAEL CARVAJAL, WARDEN and MICHAEL D. CARVAJAL
Case Number: 1:2020cv01090
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Plaintiff's Article to the List of Exhibits for Case. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file DENIED, in light of the physical removal of this case to the District of South Carolina per the Transfer Order. The Clerk shall transmit this document to the receiving court." Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 05/08/2020. (ztd) Modified to add fiat on 5/12/2020 (znmw).
May 1, 2020 Receipt on 04/29/2020 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 0:20-cv-01722 sent by District of South Carolina. (zrdj)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred to the USDC for the South Carolina, pursuant to the Court Order entered 4/29/2020. Sent to Court via Extraction. (ztd) (ztd).
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER transferring the case immediately to the U.S. District Court for the District of South Carolina (see document for details). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/29/20.(ah)
April 28, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number: 4616102976. (ztd)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MICHAEL BOBKA.(ztd);(receipt pending in finance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOBKA v. WARDEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MICHAEL CARVAJAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MICHAEL D. CARVAJAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICHAEL BOBKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?