GCDC LLC v. THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. et al
Plaintiff: GCDC LLC
Defendant: SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY, LTD and THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01094
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part, for good cause shown, the parties' #7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint by July 10, 2020. It is further ORDERED that if Defendants respond by filing a motion, Plaintiff shall have 30 days to oppose the motion and Defendants shall have 14 days after Plaintiff opposes to file any reply in favor of the motion. Finally, it is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed scheduling order to govern class certification proceedings by July 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/12/2020. (lctjk1)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC., SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY, LTD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Winston, Frank)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests Corporate Disclosure Statement by HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC., SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY, LTD (Winston, Frank)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY, LTD served on 5/22/2020, answer due 6/12/2020 (Friedman, Andrew)
June 3, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/12/2020. (ztth)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. served on 5/22/2020, answer due 6/12/2020 (Friedman, Andrew); Modified text, date of service, and answer deadline on 6/3/2020 (ztth).
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY, LTD, THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
April 27, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (adh, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GCDC LLC (Friedman, Andrew)
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD., THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7063065) filed by GCDC LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., #3 Summons Summons - Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd..)(Friedman, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GCDC LLC v. THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GCDC LLC
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?