AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERS, LLC et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC., WELLINGTON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, MCALLEN HOSPITALS, LP, SAN ANTONIO REGIONAL HOSPITAL, NICHOLAS H. NOYES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., NORTHWEST TEXAS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., WYCKOFF HEIGHTS MEDICAL CENTER, EMORY UNIVERSITY, VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, COOKEVILLE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AUTHORITY, CABELL HUNTINGTON HOSPITAL, INC., AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERS, LLC, NIX HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC, REDLANDS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INTEGRIS BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, UHS OF TEXOMA, INC., MANATEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, L.P., LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION, INTEGRIS SOUTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER, SUMMERLIN HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, POMONA VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, AUBURN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., FAUQUIER MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, UHS-CORONA, INC., UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES OF RANCHO SPRINGS, INC., KAWEAH DELTA HEALTH CARE DISTRICT, SLIDELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MAURY REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LAREDO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, L.P., DISTRICT HOSPITAL PARTNERS, LP, INTEGRIS BASS BAPTIST HEALTH CENTER, TRINITAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MISSISSIPPI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, INC., ALTA LOS ANGELES HOSPITALS, INC., FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY'S REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SPARKS FAMILY HOSPITAL, INC., SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., TRI-CITY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT, COOPER HEALTH SYSTEM, ST. JOSEPH'S UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. doing business as SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL AT CULVER CITY formerly known as BROTMAN MEDICAL CENTER, CABELL HUNTINGTON HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as CABELL HUNTINGTON HOSPITAL, UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES OF RANCHO SPRINGS, INC. doing business as SOUTHWEST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, LAREDO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, L.P. doing business as DOCTOR'S HOSPITAL OF LAREDO, SAN ANTONIO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, NORTHWEST TEXAS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. doing business as NORTHWEST TEXAS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, COOKEVILLE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AUTHORITY doing business as COOKEVILLE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER doing business as COMMUNITY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, DISTRICT HOSPITAL PARTNERS, LP doing business as GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, WELLINGTON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as WELLINGTON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERS, LLC doing business as AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERS, SLIDELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL doing business as ST. TAMMANY PARISH HOSPITAL SERVICE DISTRICT NO. 2, VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC doing business as VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, KAWEAH DELTA HEALTH CARE DISTRICT doing business as KAWEAH DELTA MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JOSEPH, FAUQUIER MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as FAUQUIER HOSPITAL, BROTMAN MEDICAL CENTER, TRI-CITY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT doing business as TRI-CITY MEDICAL CENTER, SUMMERLIN HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as SUMMERLIN HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, NICHOLAS H. NOYES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as NICHOLAS H. NOYES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, AUBURN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as AUBURN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MAURY REGIONAL HOSPITAL doing business as WAYNE MEDICAL CENTER, EMORY UNIVERSITY doing business as EMORY UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL MIDTOWN, VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC doing business as SPRING VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, MCALLEN HOSPITALS, LP doing business as SOUTH TEXAS HEALTH SYSTEM, MAURY REGIONAL HOSPITAL doing business as MAURY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ALTA LOS ANGELES HOSPITALS, INC. doing business as LOS ANGELES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC doing business as DESERT SPRINGS HOSPITAL, EMORY UNIVERSITY doing business as EMORY UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COOPER HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, UHS-CORONA, INC. doing business as CORONA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC doing business as CENTENNIAL HILLS HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, MCALLEN HOSPITALS, LP doing business as MCALLEN MEDICAL HEART HOSPITAL, SPARKS FAMILY HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as NORTHERN NEVADA MEDICAL CENTER, MISSISSIPPI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as MISSISSIPPI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, UHS OF TEXOMA, INC. doing business as TEXOMA MEDICAL CENTER, MANATEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, L.P. doing business as MANATEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, NIX HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC doing business as NIX HEALTH CARE SYSTEM and FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER doing business as CLOVIS COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv01097
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's #7 Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings and Vacate Deadline to Respond to Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for the defendant to respond to the complaint is VACATED. It is further ORDERED that this the case shall be STAYED pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/25/20. (lccrc1)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings, Consent MOTION to Vacate Deadline to Respond to Complaint by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALEX M. AZAR, II. Case related to Case No. 19-mc-00190. (Bryce, Peter)
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 5/18/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/18/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/19/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/18/2020.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carroll, Kelly)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Bryce on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Bryce, Peter)
April 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
April 28, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmc)
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERS, LLC, ALTA LOS ANGELES HOSPITALS, INC., AUBURN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., CABELL HUNTINGTON HOSPITAL, INC., COOKEVILLE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AUTHORITY, COOPER HEALTH SYSTEM, DISTRICT HOSPITAL PARTNERS, LP, EMORY UNIVERSITY, FAUQUIER MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, INTEGRIS BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, INTEGRIS BASS BAPTIST HEALTH CENTER, INTEGRIS SOUTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER, KAWEAH DELTA HEALTH CARE DISTRICT, LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION, LAREDO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, L.P., MANATEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, L.P., MAURY REGIONAL HOSPITAL, MCALLEN HOSPITALS, LP, MISSISSIPPI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, INC., NICHOLAS H. NOYES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., NIX HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC, NORTHWEST TEXAS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., POMONA VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, REDLANDS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC., SAN ANTONIO REGIONAL HOSPITAL, SLIDELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., SPARKS FAMILY HOSPITAL, INC., ST. JOSEPH'S UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY'S REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SUMMERLIN HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, TRI-CITY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT, TRINITAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, UHS OF TEXOMA, INC., UHS-CORONA, INC., UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES OF RANCHO SPRINGS, INC., VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, WELLINGTON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, WYCKOFF HEIGHTS MEDICAL CENTER (Carroll, Kelly)
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7063785) filed by NORTHWEST TEXAS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., MANATEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, L.P., INTEGRIS BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC., FAUQUIER MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, TRI-CITY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT, EMORY UNIVERSITY, LAREDO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, L.P., AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERS, LLC, POMONA VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, INTEGRIS SOUTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER, SUMMERLIN HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, COOKEVILLE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AUTHORITY, MAURY REGIONAL HOSPITAL, TRINITAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MCALLEN HOSPITALS, LP, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, SAN ANTONIO REGIONAL HOSPITAL, MISSISSIPPI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, INC., INTEGRIS BASS BAPTIST HEALTH CENTER, ST. JOSEPH'S UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, WYCKOFF HEIGHTS MEDICAL CENTER, ALTA LOS ANGELES HOSPITALS, INC., SLIDELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, UHS OF TEXOMA, INC., SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., KAWEAH DELTA HEALTH CARE DISTRICT, LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION, NIX HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC, COOPER HEALTH SYSTEM, DISTRICT HOSPITAL PARTNERS, LP, NICHOLAS H. NOYES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., ST. MARY'S REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, UHS-CORONA, INC., CABELL HUNTINGTON HOSPITAL, INC., UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES OF RANCHO SPRINGS, INC., SPARKS FAMILY HOSPITAL, INC., WELLINGTON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, REDLANDS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, AUBURN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Alex M. Azar II, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services, #4 Summons to Hon. William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States, #5 Summons to Hon. Timothy J. Shea, United States Attorney for the District of Columbia, #6 Summons to Robert P. Charrow, General Counsel, United States Department of Health and Human Services)(Carroll, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERS, LLC et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WELLINGTON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCALLEN HOSPITALS, LP
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAN ANTONIO REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS H. NOYES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTHWEST TEXAS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WYCKOFF HEIGHTS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMORY UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COOKEVILLE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AUTHORITY
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CABELL HUNTINGTON HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERS, LLC
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIX HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REDLANDS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTEGRIS BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS OF TEXOMA, INC.
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANATEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, L.P.
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTEGRIS SOUTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUMMERLIN HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POMONA VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUBURN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAUQUIER MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS-CORONA, INC.
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES OF RANCHO SPRINGS, INC.
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAWEAH DELTA HEALTH CARE DISTRICT
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SLIDELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAURY REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAREDO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, L.P.
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT HOSPITAL PARTNERS, LP
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTEGRIS BASS BAPTIST HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRINITAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MISSISSIPPI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALTA LOS ANGELES HOSPITALS, INC.
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. MARY'S REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPARKS FAMILY HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRI-CITY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COOPER HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. JOSEPH'S UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. doing business as SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL AT CULVER CITY formerly known as BROTMAN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CABELL HUNTINGTON HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as CABELL HUNTINGTON HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES OF RANCHO SPRINGS, INC. doing business as SOUTHWEST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAREDO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, L.P. doing business as DOCTOR'S HOSPITAL OF LAREDO
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAN ANTONIO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTHWEST TEXAS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. doing business as NORTHWEST TEXAS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COOKEVILLE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AUTHORITY doing business as COOKEVILLE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER doing business as COMMUNITY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT HOSPITAL PARTNERS, LP doing business as GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WELLINGTON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as WELLINGTON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERS, LLC doing business as AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERS
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SLIDELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL doing business as ST. TAMMANY PARISH HOSPITAL SERVICE DISTRICT NO. 2
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC doing business as VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAWEAH DELTA HEALTH CARE DISTRICT doing business as KAWEAH DELTA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. JOSEPH
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAUQUIER MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as FAUQUIER HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROTMAN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRI-CITY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT doing business as TRI-CITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUMMERLIN HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as SUMMERLIN HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS H. NOYES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as NICHOLAS H. NOYES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUBURN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as AUBURN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAURY REGIONAL HOSPITAL doing business as WAYNE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMORY UNIVERSITY doing business as EMORY UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL MIDTOWN
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC doing business as SPRING VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCALLEN HOSPITALS, LP doing business as SOUTH TEXAS HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAURY REGIONAL HOSPITAL doing business as MAURY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALTA LOS ANGELES HOSPITALS, INC. doing business as LOS ANGELES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC doing business as DESERT SPRINGS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMORY UNIVERSITY doing business as EMORY UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COOPER HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS-CORONA, INC. doing business as CORONA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC doing business as CENTENNIAL HILLS HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCALLEN HOSPITALS, LP doing business as MCALLEN MEDICAL HEART HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPARKS FAMILY HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as NORTHERN NEVADA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MISSISSIPPI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as MISSISSIPPI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS OF TEXOMA, INC. doing business as TEXOMA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANATEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, L.P. doing business as MANATEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIX HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC doing business as NIX HEALTH CARE SYSTEM
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER doing business as CLOVIS COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Peter M. Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?