MEEK v. FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MEEK
Defendant: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv01156
Filed: May 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 10:1006
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/11/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/14/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/13/2020.) (Link, Richard)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION served on 5/14/2020 (Link, Richard)
May 4, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
May 4, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, )
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION as Receiver for Resolute Bank ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7086646) filed by Michael Meek. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Timothy Shea, #3 Summons William Barr, #4 Summons Robert Feldman)(Link, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEEK v. FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MEEK
Represented By: Richard J. Link
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?