SCHINDLER v. U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
Petitioner: CHARLES SCHINDLER
Respondent: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Case Number: 1:2020cv01162
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As Petitioner has failed to comply with the Court's Order of May 6, 2020, it ORDERS that the case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/9/2020. (lcjeb3)
May 6, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice due by 5/27/2020. (znbn)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Although his Petition is labeled a writ of habeas corpus, Petitioner seeks "compassionate release." As 18 U.S.C. 3582(c)(1)(A)(i), which governs such release, speaks of motions submitted to the sentencing judge, this Court doubts it has jurisdiction to entertain the Petition. As a result, the Court ORDERS that by May 27, 2020, Petitioner shall notify this Court which court and judge imposed his sentence, and he shall show cause why this Court has jurisdiction; absent a persuasive explanation, the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/6/2020. (lcjeb3)
May 5, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number: 4616103017. (ztth)
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 EMERGENCY PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by CHARLES SCHINDLER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit N, #14 Exhibit O, #15 Exhibit P, #16 Exhibit Q, #17 Exhibit R, #18 Exhibit S, #19 Exhibit T, #20 Exhibit U, #21 Exhibit V, #22 Exhibit W, #23 Exhibit X, #24 Exhibit Y, #25 Exhibit Z, #26 Exhibit 1, #27 Exhibit 2, #28 Civil Cover Sheet) (ztth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHINDLER v. U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CHARLES SCHINDLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?