D.A.M. et al v. BARR et al
Plaintiff: S.L.V., M.A.S., Y.H.A., a minor, M.F.L., A.P.O., L.O.R., D.A.M., ALL PLAINTIFFS, D.M.S., J.S.M., J.S.P., L.M.L., E.P.V., S.G.H., S.M.C., A.R.A., L.C.R., I.F.L., C.A.A., R.P.F., E.A.N., Y.H.A., I.G.L., C.G.M., N.M.L., M.R.M., A.G.L., Y.V.O., N.M.M., J.F.P., A.R.M., M.G.V., D.P.R., R.L.A., M.A.A., J.G.A., M.C.M., A.A.M., C.C.G., K.N.E., E.C.G., C.C.N., A.R.G., M.R.A., J.A.R., J.M.R., E. G. M., S.B.P., M.M.V., M.M.B., R.F.L., B.S.C., A.L.V. and A.G.H.
Defendant: CHAD WOLF, WILLIAM BARR and N.C.L.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01321
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Alien Detainee (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT Verified Amended Petition for Writ of Habeus Corpus & Complaint for Declaratory And Injunctive Relief against All Plaintiffs filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS.(Barringer, Steven)
June 29, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE re #28 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by WILLIAM BARR, CHAD WOLF. (Reuveni, Erez)
June 26, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Barringer, Steven)
June 26, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Make the Road New York v. Wolf, #2 Exhibit DHS v. Thuraissigiam)(Barringer, Steven)
June 25, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by WILLIAM BARR, CHAD WOLF (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DHS v. Thuraissigiam, No. 19-161)(Reuveni, Erez)
June 9, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re E.G.M., J.A.R., and J.G.A. (Barringer, Steven)
June 8, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Judicial Notice of Congressional Testimony by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barringer, Steven) Modified relief on 6/9/2020 (ztd).
June 3, 2020 Filing 24 ERRATA by WILLIAM BARR, CHAD WOLF #23 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by CHAD WOLF, WILLIAM BARR. (Attachments: #1 Slip Opinion re: A.S.M. v. Warden, Stewart County Detention Center)(Hair, Christopher)
June 3, 2020 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by WILLIAM BARR, CHAD WOLF (Attachments: #1 Respondents' Surreply, #2 Declaration of Richard M. Hunt, #3 Declaration of Christopher George, #4 Declaration Jaime J. Martinez, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hair, Christopher)
May 27, 2020 Filing 22 TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING before Judge Christopher R. Cooper held on May 22, 2020; Page Numbers: 1-50. Date of Issuance:May 27, 2020. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa A. Moreira, RDR, CRR, Telephone number (202) 354-3187, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the cour t reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/17/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2020.(Moreira, Lisa)
May 26, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to opposition to motion re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Hearing MOTION to Stay filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Caroline J. Heller)(Barringer, Steven)
May 22, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Heller on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS (Heller, Caroline)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As indicated at today's hearing, petitioners' #19 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief and Supplemental Declarations is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 05/22/2020. (lccrc3)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 05/22/2020. (lccrc3)
May 22, 2020 Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held before Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/22/2020. Oral arguments submitted on Petitioner's Motion #6 for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion taken under advisement, forthcoming order. (Court Reporter: Lisa Moreira) (lsj)
May 21, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #18 Affidavit was entered in error and attached to docket entry no. #17 . (ztd)
May 21, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION Leave to File Reply Brief and Supplemental Declarations by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barringer, Steven) Modified event on 5/26/2020 (znmw).
May 21, 2020 Filing 18 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .AFFIDAVIT re #17 Memorandum in Opposition (Declaration of Robert Cordero) by WILLIAM BARR, CHAD WOLF. (Hair, Christopher) Modified on 5/22/2020 (ztd).
May 21, 2020 Filing 17 Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Hearing MOTION to Stay filed by WILLIAM BARR, CHAD WOLF. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mellissa Harper)(Hair, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/22/2020: #2 Declaration Robert Cordero) (ztd).
May 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Erez Reuveni on behalf of All Defendants (Reuveni, Erez)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. For the reasons stated in the attached Order, the Court found that the case is not related to Civil Action No. 19-2773, and it ordered that the case be sent to the Calendar and Case Management Committee for random reassignment on May 19, 2020. See Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/21/2020. (lcabj2)
May 20, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM BARR, CHAD WOLF, and U.S. Attorney (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Standing Order 20-19 (BAH), the Court will provide access for the public to participate in the hearing on the motion for temporary restraining order. It is ORDERED that the participants using the public access telephone line shall adhere to the rules set forth in Standing Order 20-20 (BAH), available on the Court's website.Toll Free Number: 888-204-5984; Access Code: 8981531 Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/20/2020. (lsj)
May 19, 2020 Filing 13 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. Judge Amy Berman Jackson is no longer assigned to the case as deemed not related. (ztnr)
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of All Defendants (Hair, Christopher)
May 19, 2020 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TELEPHONE HEARING PROCEEDINGS before Judge Carl J. Nichols held on May 18, 2020; Page Numbers: 1-34. Date of Issuance: May 19, 2020. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public termina l or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/19/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2020.(wz)
May 19, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Caroline J. Heller, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7138501. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Barringer, Steven)
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance- Pro Bono by Sarah Telo Gillman on behalf of A.P.O., ALL PLAINTIFFS, D.A.M., D.M.S., J.S.M., J.S.P., L.O.R., M.A.S., M.F.L., S.L.V., Y.H.A., a minor (Gillman, Sarah)
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance- Pro Bono by Gregory P. Copeland on behalf of A.P.O., ALL PLAINTIFFS, D.A.M., D.M.S., J.S.M., J.S.P., L.O.R., M.A.S., M.F.L., S.L.V., Y.H.A., a minor (Copeland, Gregory)
May 19, 2020 Payment for #3 Complaint. ($400; Receipt number ADCDC-7138387). (Barringer, Steven)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that #8 the administrative stay entered by the emergency motions judge shall be extended until the Court decides plaintiffs' #6 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. The government shall file its response to the plaintiffs' motion by Thursday, May 21, 2020 at 5:00 pm, and the Court will hold a telephonic hearing on the motion on Friday, May 22, 2020 at 10:00 am. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 05/19/2020. (lccrc3)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court finds that this matter is not related to M.M.V. v. Barr, Civ. A. No. 19-2773, for reasons to be set forth in a written order. This case shall be referred to the Calendar and Case Management Committee for random reassignment. The administrative stay entered by the emergency motions judge #8 will be extended until the matter can be assessed by the judge to be assigned. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/19/2020. (lcabj2)
May 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Case related to Case No. 19-2773. (zjf)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE STAY. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 5/18/2020. (zcdw)
May 18, 2020 Filing 7 Emergency MOTION to Stay by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zjf)
May 18, 2020 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION to Stay, MOTION for Hearing by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Notice, #3 Text of Proposed Order TRO, #4 Declaration of B. Cambria, #5 Declaration of S. Fluharty, #6 Declaration C. Heller) (zjf).
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against WILLIAM BARR, CHAD WOLF filed by A.P.O., ALL PLAINTIFFS, J.S.P., J.S.M., S.L.V., Y.H.A., D.M.S., D.A.M., M.A.S., M.F.L., L.O.R.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (zjf)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 05/18/2020. (See Order for Full Details) (zjf)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym by A.P.O., ALL PLAINTIFFS, D.A.M., D.M.S., J.S.M., J.S.P., L.O.R., M.A.S., M.F.L., S.L.V., Y.H.A., (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zjf)
May 18, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carl J. Nichols: Evidentiary Hearing held on 5/18/2020 re Petitioners' Emergency Motion for the Entry of an Administrative Stay Order. Motion heard and granted. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zcdw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.A.M. et al v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.L.V.
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Represented By: Steven G. Barringer
Represented By: Sarah Telo Gillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.A.S.
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Represented By: Steven G. Barringer
Represented By: Sarah Telo Gillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y.H.A., a minor
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Represented By: Steven G. Barringer
Represented By: Sarah Telo Gillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.F.L.
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Represented By: Steven G. Barringer
Represented By: Sarah Telo Gillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.P.O.
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Represented By: Steven G. Barringer
Represented By: Sarah Telo Gillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.O.R.
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Represented By: Steven G. Barringer
Represented By: Sarah Telo Gillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.A.M.
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Represented By: Steven G. Barringer
Represented By: Sarah Telo Gillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Represented By: Steven G. Barringer
Represented By: Sarah Telo Gillman
Represented By: Caroline Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.M.S.
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Represented By: Steven G. Barringer
Represented By: Sarah Telo Gillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.S.M.
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Represented By: Steven G. Barringer
Represented By: Sarah Telo Gillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.S.P.
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Represented By: Steven G. Barringer
Represented By: Sarah Telo Gillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.M.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.P.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.G.H.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.M.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.R.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.C.R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.F.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.A.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.P.F.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.A.N.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y.H.A.
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Represented By: Steven G. Barringer
Represented By: Sarah Telo Gillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.G.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.G.M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.M.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.R.M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.G.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y.V.O.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.M.M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.F.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.R.M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.G.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.P.R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.L.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.A.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.G.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.C.M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.A.M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.C.G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.N.E.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.C.G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.C.N.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.R.G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.R.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.A.R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.M.R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. G. M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.B.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.M.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.M.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.F.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.L.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.G.H.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD WOLF
Represented By: Christopher Charles Hair
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: Christopher Charles Hair
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.C.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?