XIONG et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY et al
Plaintiff: SHOUA MOUA, BRANDY XIONG, JOHN TOU XIONG, LA VANG, CHARLIE SOUA XIONG and SENG XIONG
Defendant: CHASE BANK, CITIBANK, WELLS FARGO BANK, SAINT PAUL POLICE DEPARTMENT and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
Case Number: 1:2020cv01346
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' #5 stipulation of dismissal, it is ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice as against defendant Wells Fargo Bank. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/25/2020. (lcabj3)
June 16, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to Wells Fargo Bank only by WELLS FARGO BANK. (Morrissy, John)
May 25, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to CHASE BANK, CITIBANK, SAINT PAUL POLICE DEPARTMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, WELLS FARGO BANK. (jf)
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint filed by SENG XIONG. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by SENG XIONG.(McMahon, Martin)
May 21, 2020 SUMMONS Not Issued as to CHASE BANK, CITIBANK, SAINT PAUL POLICE DEPARTMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, WELLS FARGO BANK.....INCORRECT SUMMONSES REQUESTED. (zsb)
May 21, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE Exhibit A by SENG XIONG re #1 Complaint (McMahon, Martin)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7143365) filed by SENG XIONG. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McMahon, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: XIONG et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASE BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIBANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAINT PAUL POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHOUA MOUA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDY XIONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN TOU XIONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LA VANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLIE SOUA XIONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SENG XIONG
Represented By: Martin F. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?