BANDALI v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Plaintiff: NOORYA BANDALI
Defendant: ANN MARIE JORDAN-STARKS, CHAD WOLF, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2020cv01398
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 8 U.S.C. ยง 1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent #5 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by November 2, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 07/16/2020. (lcjeb2)
July 16, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/2/2020. (znbn)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, ANN MARIE JORDAN-STARKS, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CHAD WOLF (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Tilghman on behalf of KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, ANN MARIE JORDAN-STARKS, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CHAD WOLF (Tilghman, Michael)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI served on 6/4/2020; ANN MARIE JORDAN-STARKS served on 6/1/2020; U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 6/4/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 6/4/2020; CHAD WOLF served on 6/4/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/05/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/5/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/4/2020.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hacking, James)
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, ANN MARIE JORDAN-STARKS, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CHAD WOLF, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7164089) filed by NOORYA BANDALI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Hacking, James)
May 27, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BANDALI v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANN MARIE JORDAN-STARKS
Represented By: Michael A. Tilghman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD WOLF
Represented By: Michael A. Tilghman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI
Represented By: Michael A. Tilghman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Michael A. Tilghman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Michael A. Tilghman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOORYA BANDALI
Represented By: James O. Hacking, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?