NUNES v. WP COMPANY LLC et al
Plaintiff: DEVIN G. NUNES
Defendant: SHANE HARRIS and WP COMPANY LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01403
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. If either side wishes to supplement its motion to dismiss papers with controlling D.C. Circuit caselaw or persuasive authority from this District Court, it may do so by June 10, 2020. Any supplemental brief shall be limited to no more than 10 double-spaced pages. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/27/2020. (lcapm2)
May 27, 2020 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 3:20-cv-00146. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 22, 2020 Case transferred to District of District of Columbia. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/27/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that Defendant WP Company LLC's #10 MOTION TO TRANSFER is granted. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 5/21/2020. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/27/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 5/21/2020. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/27/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by WP Company, LLC. (Rose, Emily) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/27/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by WP Company, LLC. (Rose, Emily) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/27/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 16 Memorandum in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Devin G. Nunes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter Opinion in Depp v. Heard)(Biss, Steven) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/27/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 15 Memorandum in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Devin G. Nunes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter Opinion in Depp v. Heard)(Biss, Steven) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/27/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Thomas Goodman Hentoff for WP Company, LLC. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 03/27/2020. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/27/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Nicholas Gamse for WP Company, LLC. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 03/27/2020. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/27/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Kevin T. Baine for WP Company, LLC. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 03/27/2020. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/27/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by WP Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rose, Emily) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/27/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Transfer Case by WP Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rose, Emily) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/27/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by WP Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rose, Emily) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/27/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by WP Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rose, Emily) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/27/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas G. Gamse and Certification of Local Counsel Emily A. Rose Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7138396. by WP Company, LLC. (Rose, Emily) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/27/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas G. Hentoff and Certification of Local Counsel Emily A. Rose Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7138394. by WP Company, LLC. (Rose, Emily) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/27/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin T. Baine and Certification of Local Counsel Emily A. Rose Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7138393. by WP Company, LLC. (Rose, Emily) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/27/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WP Company, LLC. (Rose, Emily) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/27/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Shane Harris, WP Company, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/27/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Devin G. Nunes. (Biss, Steven) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/27/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/27/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7100209.), filed by Devin G. Nunes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Biss, Steven) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NUNES v. WP COMPANY LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANE HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WP COMPANY LLC
Represented By: Thomas Goodman Hentoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVIN G. NUNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?