HILL v. JOHNSON et al
Petitioner: ISIAH HILL
Respondent: PATRICIA CUSHWA and LENNARD JOHNSON
Case Number: 1:2020cv01420
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the government to show cause within 20 days from service of Petition why the Writ of Habeas Corpus should not issue; directing court officials to effectuate prompt service upon the United States (see document for details). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/2/2020. (dm)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 06/18/20. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac)
June 8, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (adh, )
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that petitioner's application for leave to proceed IFP #2 is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall assign this action randomly to a judge for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/5/2020. (dm)
May 28, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 05/28/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HILL v. JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ISIAH HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PATRICIA CUSHWA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LENNARD JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?