BANKS v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: YVONNE BANKS
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2020cv01463
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Issue Subpoena by YVONNE BANKS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1, #2 Exhibit Exh 2, #3 Exhibit Exh 3)(Smith, Gina)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (1) Issued as to U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by YVONNE BANKS.(Smith, Gina)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by YVONNE BANKS.(Smith, Gina)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by YVONNE BANKS.(Smith, Gina)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 3, 2020. (lcbah4)
June 3, 2020 SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (adh, )
June 3, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7190406) filed by Yvonne Banks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Smith, Gina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BANKS v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YVONNE BANKS
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?