CAPITAL BANK, N.A. v. GANGES FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC
Plaintiff: CAPITAL BANK, N.A.
Defendant: GANGES FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01470
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff must respond to the motion to dismiss by August 20, 2020. The parties should note that under the Local Rules, the way to accomplish an agreed extension of time is to file a joint motion and not a stipulation. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/30/2020. (lcabj3)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re #8 First MOTION to Dismiss by CAPITAL BANK, N.A.. (Schreiber, Martin)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION to Dismiss by GANGES FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, John)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant must respond to the complaint by July 16, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/6/2020. (lcabj3)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by GANGES FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, John)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GANGES FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC (Carter, John)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Edward Carter on behalf of GANGES FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC (Carter, John)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GANGES FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC served on 6/11/2020, answer due 7/2/2020 (Schreiber, Martin)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to GANGES FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
June 5, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CAPITAL BANK, N.A. (Schreiber, Martin)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAPITAL BANK, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7196613) filed by CAPITAL BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons)(Schreiber, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAPITAL BANK, N.A. v. GANGES FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAPITAL BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Martin Harold Schreiber, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GANGES FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC
Represented By: John Edward Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?