PARKS v. UNITED STATES PAROLE COMMISSION
Plaintiff: DARRELL JAMES PARKS
Defendant: UNITED STATES PAROLE COMMISSION
Case Number: 1:2020cv01481
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the respondent to show cause. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 11, 2020. (lcdlf1)
June 8, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, )
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that petitioner's application for leave to proceed IFP #2 is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall assign this action randomly to a judge for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/5/2020. (dm)
June 3, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 6/3/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PARKS v. UNITED STATES PAROLE COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES PAROLE COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARRELL JAMES PARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?