HOFFMAN v. STATE REGULATORY REGISTRY LLC (SRR) et al
Plaintiff: DAVID E. HOFFMAN, JR.
Defendant: HOMAYOUN RANJIJIFROODY, LOANSMARTER INC., STATE REGULATORY REGISTRY LLC (SRR), LOANSMART CAPITAL LLC, IAN JOUETT, HOWIE JAYS and TRACY LYNN JOUETT
Case Number: 1:2020cv01493
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court notes that the docket in this case reflects that no summonses have been issued and no proofs of service have been filed. Plaintiff is therefore advised that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(b), it is his responsibility to present any required summonses to the Clerk of the Court for signature and seal. Plaintiff may obtain copies of the relevant summonses from the Court's website under the tab "Pro Se Help." Plaintiff is further advised that service must be accomplished consistent with, as applicable, Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(e), which applies to individuals within the United States, or Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(h), which applies to corporations, partnerships, and associations. Plaintiff is further advised that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), he must serve Defendants within 90 days of filing the complaint or show good cause for an extension. Failure to serve Defendants within 90 days--here, by August 31, 2020--or to show good cause for an extension will result in a mandatory dismissal of this action as to any unserved defendants. Finally, Plaintiff is advised that he must comply with the proof of service requirement of Federal Rule of Civil procedure 4(l)(1). A party's pro se status does not relieve it of the obligation to comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or this Court's local rules. Akers v. Liberty Mut. Grp., 274 F.R.D. 346, 349 (D.D.C. 2011). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, in order to avoid a mandatory dismissal of this action as to any unserved defendants, by August 31, 2020, Plaintiff shall either (1) cause process to be served upon all Defendants and file proof of service with the Court, or (2) file a motion to enlarge time to serve process and show good cause, if any, for failure to serve process in a timely fashion. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/8/2020. (lctjk3)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to #1 Complaint, filed by DAVID E. HOFFMAN, JR. (ztth)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent and/or trademark. (znmw)
June 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 7/10/2020. (zkh)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's complaint violates Local Rule 5.1(c) because it does not identify his "full residence address," instead listing a PO box. See Hickman v. United States, No. 19-cv-2283 (UNA), 2019 WL 5597206, at *1 (D.D.C. Oct. 29, 2019). "Failure to provide the address information within 30 days upon filing may result in the dismissal of the case against the defendant." LCvR 11.1. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall amend his complaint to list his full residence address or move for leave to use a PO box by July 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/10/2020. (lctjk3)
June 10, 2020 SUMMONS Not Issued as to HOWIE JAYS, IAN JOUETT, TRACY LYNN JOUETT, LOANSMART CAPITAL LLC, LOANSSMART LLC, MORTGAGE ENTERPRISE AMERICA INC, HOMAYOUN RANJIJIFROODY, STATE REGULATORY REGISTRY LLC (SRR). (ztth)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HOWIE JAYS, IAN JOUETT, TRACY LYNN JOUETT, LOANSMART CAPITAL LLC, LOANSSMART LLC, MORTGAGE ENTERPRISE AMERICA INC, HOMAYOUN RANJIJIFROODY, STATE REGULATORY REGISTRY LLC (SRR) with Jury Demand filed by DAVID E. HOFFMAN, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (ztth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOFFMAN v. STATE REGULATORY REGISTRY LLC (SRR) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOMAYOUN RANJIJIFROODY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOANSMARTER INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE REGULATORY REGISTRY LLC (SRR)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOANSMART CAPITAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAN JOUETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWIE JAYS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY LYNN JOUETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID E. HOFFMAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?