J. B. B. C. v. WOLF et al
Plaintiff: J. B. B. C. and E.Y.
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II, RODNEY S. SCOTT, MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, HEIDI STIRRUP, CHAD F. WOLF, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, TODD C. OWEN and MARK A. MORGAN
Petitioner: SCHOLARS OF REFUGEE AND IMMIGRATION LAW
Amicus Curiae: INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT
Case Number: 1:2020cv01509
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 8:1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by J. B. B. C., E.Y. (Gelernt, Lee)
July 23, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, HEIDI STIRRUP, CHAD F. WOLF (Attachments: #1 Declaration 2nd Decl. of Robert Danley, #2 Declaration 2d Decl. of Danielle Fernandez, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiffs' #46 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert K. Silverman, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Robert K. Silverman is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 20, 2020. (lccjn3)
July 16, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert Silverman, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7349027. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by J. B. B. C., E.Y. (Perez, Celso)
July 8, 2020 Filing 45 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MATTHEW T. ALBENCE served on 6/29/2020; ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 6/29/2020; MARK A. MORGAN served on 6/29/2020; TODD C. OWEN served on 6/29/2020; ROBERT R. REDFIELD served on 6/30/2020; RODNEY S. SCOTT served on 6/29/2020; HEIDI STIRRUP served on 6/29/2020; CHAD F. WOLF served on 6/29/2020 (Gelernt, Lee)
July 7, 2020 Filing 44 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/29/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/28/2020. (Gelernt, Lee)
July 7, 2020 Filing 43 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/29/2020. (Gelernt, Lee)
July 2, 2020 Filing 42 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by J. B. B. C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Amended Complaint)(Gelernt, Lee)
June 29, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE to the Court by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, HEIDI STIRRUP, CHAD F. WOLF (Lin, Jean)
June 29, 2020 Filing 40 Supplemental NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-01511. (Perez, Celso) Modified event title on 7/1/2020 (znmw).
June 26, 2020 Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Carl J. Nichols held on 06/24/2020; Page Numbers: 1-55. Date of Issuance:06/24/2020. Court Reporter: Nancy J. Meyer, Telephone number (202) 354-3118, Tape Number: N/A. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter refe renced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/17/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2020.(Meyer, Nancy)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 24, 2020. (lccjn3)
June 24, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/29/2020. (zcal)
June 24, 2020 Filing 37 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by J. B. B. C.. re #33 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by J. B. B. C. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by J. B. B. C.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zeg)
June 24, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Minute Order filed 6/24/2020 was entered in error and on the incorrect case docket. (zcal)
June 24, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah A. Levine on behalf of SCHOLARS OF REFUGEE AND IMMIGRATION LAW (Levine, Noah)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ENTERED IN ERROR.....MINUTE ORDER. In light of Plaintiffs' #22 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction or 5 U.S.C. 705 Stay Pending Judicial Review, it is hereby ORDERED that on or before June 29, 2020, the Parties shall meet, confer, and file a Joint Status Report that includes: (1) a proposed briefing schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion and (2) a statement addressing whether a hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion is necessary, and if so, a date for such a hearing. The Parties may also address any other issues that they believe will be helpful to the Court. Any disagreements should be noted in the Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 24, 2020. (lccjn3) Modified on 6/24/2020. Order entered in incorrect case (zcal).
June 24, 2020 Minute Order and Entry for Proceedings held before Judge Carl J. Nichols: Motion Hearing held on 6/24/2020 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by J. B. B. C.. #2 Motion for TRO; GRANTED. Further Order to be issued by the Court. Court Reporter: Nancy Meyer. (zcal)
June 23, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Mariko Hirose on behalf of INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT (Hirose, Mariko)
June 22, 2020 Filing 34 REPLY to opposition to motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by J. B. B. C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adrienne Harrold, #2 Exhibit A-E to Adrienne Harrold Declaration, #3 Declaration of Linda Corchado)(Gelernt, Lee)
June 22, 2020 Filing 33 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by J. B. B. C. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carlos Emilio Barrera Rodriguez)(Gelernt, Lee)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's #32 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Noah A. Levine, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Noah A. Levine is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 22, 2020. (lccjn3)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the #30 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Brief for Scholars of Refugee and Immigration Law as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that the [30-1] Brief shall be deemed filed. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 22, 2020. (lccjn3)
June 18, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Noah A. Levine, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7245657. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SCHOLARS OF REFUGEE AND IMMIGRATION LAW (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Noah A. Levine, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfson, Paul)
June 18, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul R.Q. Wolfson on behalf of SCHOLARS OF REFUGEE AND IMMIGRATION LAW (Wolfson, Paul)
June 18, 2020 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by SCHOLARS OF REFUGEE AND IMMIGRATION LAW (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfson, Paul)
June 18, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Pon Harrold on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Harrold, Adrienne)
June 17, 2020 Filing 28 Memorandum in opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, HEIDI STIRRUP, CHAD F. WOLF. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Affidavit (Declaration of Robert Danley), #6 Affidavit (Declaration of Danielle Hernandez), #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean) Modified docket event/text on 6/18/2020 (eg).
June 15, 2020 Filing 27 AMICUS BRIEF by INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT. (eg) Modified filed date on 6/18/2020 (znmw).
June 15, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan Russell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Russell, Morgan)
June 15, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Gelernt on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gelernt, Lee)
June 15, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Antonio Galindo on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Galindo, Daniel)
June 15, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Cody H. Wofsy on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wofsy, Cody)
June 15, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Bonggyun Kang on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kang, Stephen)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc.'s #17 Unopposed Motion for Leave to file an Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that the [17-1] Brief shall be deemed filed. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 15, 2020. (lccjn3)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cody Wofsy, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Cody Wofsy is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 15, 2020. (lccjn3)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lee Gelernt, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Lee Gelernt is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 15, 2020. (lccjn3)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Galindo, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Daniel Galindo is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 15, 2020. (lccjn3)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Morgan Russell, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Morgan Russell is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 15, 2020. (lccjn3)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adrienne Harold, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Adrienne Harold is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 15, 2020. (lccjn3)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephen B. Kang, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Stephen B. Kang is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 15, 2020. (lccjn3)
June 15, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by J. B. B. C.. Case related to Case No. 20-cv-01511. (Perez, Celso)
June 14, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #19 Memorandum was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading with a Motion for Leave to Appear Amicus. (zjf)
June 13, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Thomas Craigmyle on behalf of All Defendants (Craigmyle, Bradley)
June 12, 2020 Filing 19 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MEMORANDUM by SCHOLARS OF REFUGEE AND IMMIGRATION LAW. (Wolfson, Paul) Modified on 6/14/2020 (zjf).
June 12, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by J. B. B. C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Perez, Celso)
June 12, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hirose, Mariko)
June 12, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Matthew Snell on behalf of All Defendants (Snell, Kevin)
June 12, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Lin on behalf of All Defendants (Lin, Jean)
June 11, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zcdw)
June 11, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Cody Wofsy, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7220741. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by J. B. B. C. (Perez, Celso)
June 11, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lee Gelernt, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7220672. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by J. B. B. C. (Perez, Celso)
June 11, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel Galindo, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7220431. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by J. B. B. C. (Perez, Celso)
June 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie L. Crook on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Crook, Jamie)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Morgan Russell, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7220284. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by J. B. B. C. (Perez, Celso)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 11, 2020. (lccjn3)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Adrienne Harrold, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7216749. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by J. B. B. C. (Perez, Celso)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephen B. Kang, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7216747. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by J. B. B. C. (Perez, Celso)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the telephonic status conference held on this date, it is hereby ORDERED that before 12:00 PM on June 11, 2020, Defendants shall inform the Court whether they consent to the proposal and briefing schedule for Plaintiff's #2 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order discussed between the Court and the Parties. It is further ORDERED that the Court's #3 Order is extended until 12:00 PM on June 11, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 10, 2020. (lccjn3)
June 10, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carl J. Nichols: Hearing re #2 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order held on 6/10/2020. Defense counsel is directed to email the Court's Deputy Clerk by 12:00 PM on 6/11/2020, to inform the Court whether they're authorized to accept the Court's proposal for next steps in this matter. If the next steps proposal is accepted and agreed upon, the Court will issue a scheduling order. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (zcdw)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spitzer, Arthur)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (10) Issued Electronically as to MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, HEIDI STIRRUP, CHAD F. WOLF, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
June 10, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Hearing re #2 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order set for 6/10/2020 at 4:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zcdw)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE AS TO ACTING SECRETARY OF HOMELAND SECURITY; ACTING COMMISSIONER OF U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION; EXECUTIVE ASSISTANT COMMISSIONER, CBP OFFICE OF FIELD OPERATIONS; CHIEF OF U.S. BORDER PATROL; DEPUTY DIRECTOR OF U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT; SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES; DIRECTOR OF THE CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION; ACTING DIRECTOR OF THE OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT; ATTORNEY GENERAL; U.S. ATTORNEY filed by J. B. B. C.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Perez, Celso)
June 10, 2020 Payment for #1 Complaint. ($400; Receipt number ADCDC-7214851). (Perez, Celso)
June 10, 2020 SUMMONS Not Issued as to All Defendants (zsb)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that the parties have agreed that the government will not remove the minor child, J.B.B.C., from the United States prior to 11:59 PM on June 10, 2020, based on the representations from the attorney for Defendants. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 06/09/2020. (zsb)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by J. B. B. C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Stephen Kang, #3 Declaration of Linda Corchado, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(zsb)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by J. B. B. C.. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J. B. B. C. v. WOLF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Craigmyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RODNEY S. SCOTT
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Craigmyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Craigmyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEIDI STIRRUP
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Craigmyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD F. WOLF
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Craigmyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT R. REDFIELD
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Craigmyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD C. OWEN
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Craigmyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK A. MORGAN
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Craigmyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. B. B. C.
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Celso Perez
Represented By: Adrienne Pon Harrold
Represented By: Jamie L. Crook
Represented By: Morgan Russell
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Represented By: Daniel Antonio Galindo
Represented By: Stephen Bonggyun Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.Y.
Represented By: Celso Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SCHOLARS OF REFUGEE AND IMMIGRATION LAW
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Paul R.Q. Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?