ALSTON v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Plaintiff: KENITHIA ALSTON
Defendant: OFFICERS X, Y, A, and Z and DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Case Number: 1:2020cv01515
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 7/24/2020. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Francois, Aderson) Modified on 8/5/2020 to correct served/answer due date (zjf).
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/6/2020. (jag)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, District of Columbia Attorney General, and the District of Columbia Mayor. (zjf)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint filed by KENITHIA ALSTON. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by KENITHIA ALSTON. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request for Summons to Issue)(Francois, Aderson)
June 11, 2020 SUMMONS Not Issued as to DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, OFFICERS X, Y, A, and Z (adh, )
June 11, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (adh, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA Civil Cover Sheet by KENITHIA ALSTON #1 Complaint filed by KENITHIA ALSTON. (Francois, Aderson)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7215037) filed by KENITHIA ALSTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Francois, Aderson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALSTON v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICERS X, Y, A, and Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENITHIA ALSTON
Represented By: Aderson Bellegarde Francois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?