SIMMERS v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Plaintiff: ANDREW SIMMERS
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Case Number: 1:2020cv01548
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (McGrath, Felicity)
July 29, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/1/2020 at 11:00 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: An Initial Scheduling Conference is set for September 1, 2020, at 11:00 a.m., by telephone. The parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint report pursuant to FRCP 26(f) and Local Rule 16.3. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 07/29/2020. (lcjeb2)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK).(Singleton, Dawn)
July 14, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #3 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant; emailed to jduckworth@keller-goggin.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. PLEASE DO NOT REFILE. Pleading refiled as docket entry #4 . (ztth, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) served on 7/9/2020, answer due 7/30/2020. (ztth) (znmw).
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) served on 7/9/2020 (Duckworth, James); Modified service date on 7/13/2020 (ztth).
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
June 12, 2020 Case assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmc)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7223069) filed by ANDREW SIMMERS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Duckworth, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIMMERS v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW SIMMERS
Represented By: James M. Duckworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Represented By: Dawn Star Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?