JOHNSON-LANCASTER AND ASSOCIATES, INC. v. TB BALLSTON, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JOHNSON-LANCASTER AND ASSOCIATES, INC.
Defendant: TED'S BULLETIN HOLDINGS, LLC and TB BALLSTON, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01565
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to TB BALLSTON, LLC, TED'S BULLETIN HOLDINGS, LLC (ztd)
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT for Entry of Default as to Ted's Bulletin Holdings, LLC by JOHNSON-LANCASTER AND ASSOCIATES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartman, Charles) Modified on 7/28/2020 (ztd).
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT for Entry of Default as to TB Ballston, LLC by JOHNSON-LANCASTER AND ASSOCIATES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartman, Charles) Modified on 7/28/2020 (ztd).
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Charles Edward Hartman, III on behalf of JOHNSON-LANCASTER AND ASSOCIATES, INC. Substituting for attorney Matthew A. Egeli (Hartman, Charles)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TB BALLSTON, LLC served on 6/23/2020, answer due 7/14/2020 (Hartman, Charles)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TED'S BULLETIN HOLDINGS, LLC served on 6/26/2020, answer due 7/17/2020 (Hartman, Charles)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Edward Hartman, III on behalf of JOHNSON-LANCASTER AND ASSOCIATES, INC. (Hartman, Charles)
June 18, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #5 Notice of Appearance; emailed to matthew@egelilaw.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. Please refile document, 3. Counsel can not file on behalf of other counsel. Each must use their own passwords when fiing. (ztd, )
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Alfred Egeli on behalf of JOHNSON-LANCASTER AND ASSOCIATES, INC. (Egeli, Matthew) Modified on 6/18/2020 (ztd).
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 06/15/2020. (lccrc3)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Charles Edward Hartman, III, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7230424. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOHNSON-LANCASTER AND ASSOCIATES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Egeli, Matthew)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JOHNSON-LANCASTER AND ASSOCIATES, INC. (Egeli, Matthew)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to TB BALLSTON, LLC, TED'S BULLETIN HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
June 15, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHNSON-LANCASTER AND ASSOCIATES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7229600) filed by JOHNSON-LANCASTER AND ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A to Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to Complaint, #5 Summons for TB Ballston, LLC, #6 Summons for Ted's Bulletin Holdings, LLC, #7 LCvR 83.2 Certificate)(Egeli, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON-LANCASTER AND ASSOCIATES, INC. v. TB BALLSTON, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TED'S BULLETIN HOLDINGS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TB BALLSTON, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNSON-LANCASTER AND ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Alfred Egeli
Represented By: Charles Edward Hartman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?