BMW MANUFACTURING CO., LLC et al v. CSX TRANSPORATION, INC. et al
Plaintiff: BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC and BMW MANUFACTURING CO., LLC
Defendant: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY and CSX TRANSPORATION, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01608
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY.(Tabas, Matthew)
August 14, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Aaron Tabas on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (Tabas, Matthew)
August 10, 2020 Filing 27 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CSX TRANSPORATION, INC. (Wells, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY.(Stein, Linda)
August 10, 2020 Filing 25 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda)
August 10, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Bruder Fox on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Fox, Molly)
August 10, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Sue Stein on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda)
August 5, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Ron Wray on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule of Cases)(Wray, Ron)
July 28, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY.(Collette, Matthew)
July 28, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint by CSX TRANSPORATION, INC..(Wells, David)
July 28, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by David Matthew Wells on behalf of CSX TRANSPORATION, INC. (Wells, David)
July 28, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Coxe Mesrobian on behalf of CSX TRANSPORATION, INC. (Mesrobian, Anne)
July 14, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Halli Emmanuelle Spraggins on behalf of BMW MANUFACTURING CO., LLC, BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC (Spraggins, Halli)
July 14, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Francis DiSalvo on behalf of BMW MANUFACTURING CO., LLC, BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC (DiSalvo, Theodore)
July 14, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Swathi Bojedla on behalf of BMW MANUFACTURING CO., LLC, BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC (Bojedla, Swathi)
July 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth R. Gassman on behalf of BMW MANUFACTURING CO., LLC, BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC (Gassman, Seth)
July 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael David Hausfeld on behalf of BMW MANUFACTURING CO., LLC, BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC (Hausfeld, Michael)
July 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sathya S. Gosselin on behalf of BMW MANUFACTURING CO., LLC, BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC (Gosselin, Sathya)
July 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda R Coolidge on behalf of BMW MANUFACTURING CO., LLC, BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC (Coolidge, Melinda)
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY waiver sent on 7/8/2020, answer due 9/6/2020. (Ratner, Brian)
July 7, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE. CSX TRANSPORATION, INC. waiver sent on 7/6/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (Ratner, Brian)
June 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Collette on behalf of UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Collette, Matthew)
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE. UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY waiver sent on 6/26/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (Ratner, Brian)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY waiver sent on 6/23/2020, answer due 8/22/2020. (Ratner, Brian)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
June 19, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by BMW MANUFACTURING CO., LLC, BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. Case related to Case No. 1:20-mc-00008-BAH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ratner, Brian)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC (Ratner, Brian)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BMW MANUFACTURING CO., LLC (Ratner, Brian)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CDCDC-7243371) filed by BMW MANUFACTURING CO., LLC, BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons As to BNSF Railway Company, #3 Summons as to CSX Transportation, Inc., #4 Summons as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company, #5 Summons as to Union Pacific Railroad Company)(Ratner, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMW MANUFACTURING CO., LLC et al v. CSX TRANSPORATION, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY
Represented By: Matthew M. Collette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Matthew Aaron Tabas
Represented By: Ron Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Linda Sue Stein
Represented By: Molly Bruder Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORATION, INC.
Represented By: Anne Coxe Mesrobian
Represented By: David Matthew Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Represented By: Brian A. Ratner
Represented By: Halli E Spraggins
Represented By: Seth R. Gassman
Represented By: Swathi Bojedla
Represented By: Sathya S. Gosselin
Represented By: Michael David Hausfeld
Represented By: Theodore Francis DiSalvo
Represented By: Melinda R Coolidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMW MANUFACTURING CO., LLC
Represented By: Brian A. Ratner
Represented By: Halli E Spraggins
Represented By: Seth R. Gassman
Represented By: Swathi Bojedla
Represented By: Sathya S. Gosselin
Represented By: Michael David Hausfeld
Represented By: Theodore Francis DiSalvo
Represented By: Melinda R Coolidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?