AKEL v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Plaintiff: ANTONIO U. AKEL
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Case Number: 1:2020cv01651
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by ANTONIO U. AKEL (ztd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2020: #1 Statement) (ztd).
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/8/2020. (lcrdm1)
July 8, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, )
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $39.16 from Prison Account of ANTONIO U. AKEL and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/7/2020. (adh, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by ANTONIO U. AKEL (adh, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANTONIO U. AKEL (adh, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by ANTONIO U. AKEL. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons)(adh, )
July 1, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 7/1/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AKEL v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONIO U. AKEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?