DAVIS v. BIDEN et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY LEROY DAVIS
Defendant: JOE BIDEN, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, UNCLE JOE and GRAND WIZARD KKK
Case Number: 1:2020cv01704
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/13/2020. (zmc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Reconsideration re #4 Order Dismissing Pro Se Case by ANTHONY LEROY DAVIS (zmc)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 07/06/2020. (zsb)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes by ANTHONY LEROY DAVIS.. (zmd)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANTHONY LEROY DAVIS. (zmd)
June 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOE BIDEN, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA with Jury Demand filed by ANTHONY LEROY DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (zmd)
June 22, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 6/22/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. BIDEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE BIDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNCLE JOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAND WIZARD KKK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY LEROY DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?