DARJI v. WOLF et al
Plaintiff: DHAVALKUMAR BHARATBHAI DARJI
Defendant: LOREN K. MILLER, KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI, II and CHAD F. WOLF
Case Number: 1:2020cv01747
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/9/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Delivery Confirmation)(Stevens, Mark)
July 9, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General July 9, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Delivery Confirmation)(Stevens, Mark)
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI, II served on 7/8/2020; LOREN K. MILLER served on 7/8/2020; CHAD F. WOLF served on 7/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Return of Service - Cuccinelli, #2 Return of Service - Miller, #3 Delivery Confirmation)(Stevens, Mark)
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Stevens on behalf of DHAVALKUMAR BHARATBHAI DARJI (Stevens, Mark)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ztth)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by DHAVALKUMAR BHARATBHAI DARJI re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Messer, Benjamin); Modified event and text on 7/7/2020 (ztth).
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 30, 2020. (lcrbw3)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI, II, LOREN K. MILLER, CHAD F. WOLF. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
June 30, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (adh, )
June 29, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA by DHAVALKUMAR BHARATBHAI DARJI #1 Complaint,, filed by DHAVALKUMAR BHARATBHAI DARJI. (Attachments: #1 Errata Corrected complaint)(Messer, Benjamin)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for APA review against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7274760) filed by DHAVALKUMAR BHARATBHAI DARJI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14)(Messer, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DARJI v. WOLF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOREN K. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD F. WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DHAVALKUMAR BHARATBHAI DARJI
Represented By: Benjamin G. Messer
Represented By: Mark Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?