LAZARUS v. KARIZAD LLC et al
Plaintiff: DAVID LAZARUS
Defendant: KARIZAD LLC and WILMINGTON SAVING FUND SOCIETY FSB
Case Number: 1:2020cv01787
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by WILMINGTON SAVING FUND SOCIETY FSB. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pesachowitz, Daniel)
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 Memorandum in opposition to re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DAVID LAZARUS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit, #2 Superior Court Documents Court Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit, #4 Superior Court Documents Court Order, #5 Exhibit Transcript, #6 Exhibit Transcript)(Barnes, Johnny)
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Barnes on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Barnes, Johnny)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by DAVID LAZARUS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Barnes, Johnny)
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by KARIZAD LLC (Vavruska, Ronald)
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 Receipt on 7/9/2020 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number: 2019 CA 008433 R(RP). (zjf)
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by WILMINGTON SAVING FUND SOCIETY FSB (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Pesachowitz, Daniel)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (adh, )
July 2, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (adh, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET by WILMINGTON SAVING FUND SOCIETY FSB filed by WILMINGTON SAVING FUND SOCIETY FSB.(Pesachowitz, Daniel)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 ERRATA by WILMINGTON SAVING FUND SOCIETY FSB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pesachowitz, Daniel)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Wilmington Saving Fund Society FSB (Pesachowitz, Daniel)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Jay Pesachowitz on behalf of Wilmington Saving Fund Society FSB (Pesachowitz, Daniel)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from D.C. Superior Court, case number 2019 CA 008433 R(RP) Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-7290060 filed by Wilmington Saving Fund Society FSB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pesachowitz, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAZARUS v. KARIZAD LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARIZAD LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILMINGTON SAVING FUND SOCIETY FSB
Represented By: Daniel Jay Pesachowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID LAZARUS
Represented By: Johnny Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?