CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. v. BERNHARDT et al
Plaintiff: CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT, Director of ONRR Kimbra Davis, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR and KIMBRA DAVIS
Case Number: 1:2020cv01810
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment)(Leggette, L.)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. #21 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall adhere to the following schedule: Plaintiff will file its motion for summary judgment on or before June 30, 2021. Defendants will file their combined cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition on or before August 11, 2021. Plaintiff will file its combined reply in support of summary judgment and opposition to Defendants cross-motion on or before September 10, 2021. Defendants will file their reply on or before October 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 05/03/2021. (lcrdm1)
April 30, 2021 Filing 21 Joint STATUS REPORT by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Leggette, L.)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. In order to resolve this case as expeditiously as possible, and with the parties' consent, the parties are hereby REFERRED to the Circuit Mediator's District Court Mediation Program for settlement purposes. The parties are directed to contact the Circuit Mediator to schedule mediation at their convenience. So ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 04/29/2021. (lcaw)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Due to conflicts in the court's calendar, the mediation previously scheduled for March 29, 2021 is vacated. A new date for mediation will be set by separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 03/26/2021. (lcaw)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint request to extend the stay, Dkt. #20 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The schedule is extended as follows: Plaintiff shall file a motion, if any, concerning the contents of the administrative record, on or before April 28, 2021. Defendants shall file their response on or before May 26, 2021, and Plaintiff shall reply on or before June 9, 2021. It is further ORDERED that if Plaintiff files no motion concerning the contents of the administrative record, then the parties shall file a joint status report on or before April 30, 2021 to propose a schedule for briefing in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 02/18/2021. (lcrdm1)
February 18, 2021 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Stay re Order on Motion to Stay,,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, to Accommodate Rescheduled Mediation by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Request to Extend Stay)(Leggette, L.)
January 21, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Confidential mediation statement due by 3/22/2021; Settlement Conference reset for 3/29/2021 at 11:00 AM by VTC before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather. (kk)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Due to conflicts in the court's calendar, the mediation previously scheduled for January 27, 2021 is rescheduled to March 29, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. As directed by Order #19 dated December 17, 2020, counsel shall submit a confidential mediation statement to the Court no later than March 22, 2021, five business days prior to the mediation date. No later than March 25, 2021, two business days prior to the scheduled mediation date, counsel for each party shall advise the Court of the name, title, and contact information for each person who will participate in the mediation by videoconference and designate which individuals will have settlement or negotiating authority. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 1/21/2021. (lcaw)
December 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 1/27/2021 at 11:00 AM by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather; confidential mediation statements due 1/20/2021. (kk)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Setting Mediation and Establishing Mediation Procedures. See Order for details. Settlement Conference set for January 27, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 12/17/2020. (lcaw)
December 3, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's reply due by 4/7/2021; Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 2/26/2021. (kt)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Parties' joint motion for a stay and/or extension to accommodate mediation, Dkt. #17 and Dkt. #18 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The schedule is extended as follows. Plaintiff shall file a motion, if any, concerning the contents of the administrative record, on or before February 24, 2021. Defendants shall file their response on or before March 24, 2021, and Plaintiff shall reply on or before April 7, 2021. It is further ORDERED that if Plaintiff files no motion concerning the contents of the administrative record, Parties shall file a joint proposed schedule on or before February 25, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/02/2020. (lcrdm1)
December 2, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF Proposed Order MOTION to Stay re #17 Joint MOTION to Stay re Order,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, to Accommodate Mediation ORDER granting motion by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. (Leggette, L.) Modified text on 12/2/2020 (ztd).
December 2, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Stay re Order,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, to Accommodate Mediation by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. (Leggette, L.)
November 10, 2020 Filing 16 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Notice of Lodging) by DAVID BERNHARDT, KIMBRA DAVIS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certification, #2 Exhibit 2 - Indices)(Kim, Joseph)
October 14, 2020 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather for mediation. (zsb)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Parties' Joint Status Report, Dkt. #15 , and the Initial Scheduling Conference held on October 14, 2020, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is REFERRED to a magistrate judge, to be assigned at random, for mediation. It is further ORDERED that Defendants will file the administrative record with the Court on or before November 11, 2020; if the administrative record exceeds 400 pages, Defendants may file an index in lieu of filing the entire record. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a motion, if any, concerning the content of the administrative record, within 21 days of receiving the administrative record. Defendants are ORDERED to respond within 28 days to any such motion, and Plaintiff is ORDERED to reply within 14 days. If no such motion is filed by Plaintiff as to the administrative record, Parties are ORDERED to submit a proposed schedule for briefing the case within 21 days of filing the administrative record or index to the administrative record. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/14/2020. (lcrdm1)
October 14, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference held on 10/14/2020. Scheduling Order and Order Referring Case for Mediation, forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Sara Wick.) (kt)
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Leggette, L.)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's complaint, Dkt. #1 , and Defendants' answer, Dkt. #14 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear telephonically for an initial scheduling conference on October 14, 2020 at 10:00 a.m.. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer prior to the initial scheduling conference and submit a proposed schedule to the Court on or before October 7, 2020. The parties shall contact the Court's Deputy Clerk for logistical information concerning appearing telephonically. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/16/2020. (lcrdm1)
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by DAVID BERNHARDT, KIMBRA DAVIS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Kim, Joseph)
July 27, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #8 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant; emailed to pleggette@bakerlaw.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Duplicate of docket entry 9 (ztd, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 7/15/2020 (Leggette, L.)
July 27, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/16/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/14/2020. (Leggette, L.)
July 27, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KIMBRA DAVIS served on 7/15/2020 (Leggette, L.)
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/16/2020. (Leggette, L.)
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DAVID BERNHARDT served on 7/15/2020 (Leggette, L.)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. served on 7/15/2020 (Leggette, L.) Modified on 7/27/2020 (ztd).
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to DAVID BERNHARDT, KIMBRA DAVIS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ztd)
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #3 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests, #5 Order, #1 Complaint, #4 Notice of Related Case, #2 Errata, filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. Related document: #3 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC., #5 Order, #1 Complaint, filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC., #4 Notice of Related Case filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC., #2 Errata, filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC..(Leggette, L.)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/7/2020. (lcrdm1)
July 7, 2020 SUMMONS Not Issued as to DAVID BERNHARDT, KIMBRA DAVIS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (adh, )
July 7, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-2197. (adh, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. (adh, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. #1 Complaint, filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Signature Page - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Signature Page - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Designation of Related Cases)(Leggette, L.)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAVID BERNHARDT, Kimbra Davis, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7297118) filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Continental Resources v. Gould, #2 Exhibit B - Resp. Response to Appellant's Brief, #3 Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), #4 Declaration Certificate Rule LCvR 7.1, #5 Notice to Counsel/Party Notice of Designation of Related Cases)(Leggette, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. v. BERNHARDT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT
Represented By: Joseph H. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of ONRR Kimbra Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: Joseph H. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBRA DAVIS
Represented By: Joseph H. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.
Represented By: L. Poe Leggette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?