ADAMS, NASH & HASKELL, INC. v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: ADAMS, NASH & HASKELL, INC.
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2020cv01916
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit 60, #62 Exhibit 61, #63 Exhibit 62, #64 Exhibit 63, #65 Exhibit 64, #66 Exhibit 65, #67 Exhibit 66, #68 Exhibit 67, #69 Exhibit 68, #70 Exhibit 69, #71 Exhibit 70, #72 Exhibit 71, #73 Exhibit 72, #74 Exhibit 73, #75 Exhibit 74, #76 Exhibit 75, #77 Exhibit 76, #78 Exhibit 77, #79 Exhibit 78, #80 Exhibit 79, #81 Exhibit 80, #82 Exhibit 81, #83 Text of Proposed Order, #84 Certificate of Service)(Holvey, Patrick)
August 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 9/1/2020. Responses due by 9/28/2020. Replies due by 10/19/2020. (tj)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #21 the parties' proposed briefing schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the United States shall file any motions under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) on or before September 1, 2020; Plaintiff shall file any response on or before September 28, 2020; and the United States shall file any reply on or before October 19, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/19/2020. (lcrc3)
August 19, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED BRIEFING ORDER REGARDING THE UNITED STATES MOTION TO DISMISS by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Holvey, Patrick)
August 19, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Elise Bouchez on behalf of ADAMS, NASH & HASKELL, INC. (Bouchez, Ashley)
August 19, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Attison L. Barnes, III on behalf of ADAMS, NASH & HASKELL, INC. (Barnes, Attison)
August 18, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick C Holvey on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Holvey, Patrick)
August 18, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie E. Rosato on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Rosato, Carrie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:19-cv-03529. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 19, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/16/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER transferring case to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia. Defendant's motion to dismiss for improper venue is denied, its alternative request to transfer under 1404(a) is denied as moot, and its motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction under Rule 12(b)(1) and for failure to state a claim under Rule 12(b)(6) is denied without prejudice. Defendant may re-file the motion to dismiss with the transferee court in the District of Columbia. The Clerk shall close this matter. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 3/19/20. (jc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/16/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Filing 14 OPINION. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 3/19/20. (jc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/16/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to BRETT A. SCHATZ, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW040298 (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/16/2020.]
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice TO ADMIT BRETT A. SCHATZ, ESQ. by ADAMS, NASH & HASKELL, INC., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 8/5/2019. (JB, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/16/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 Exhibit to QC - Electronic signature does not match e-filer, by ADAMS, NASH & HASKELL, INC.. (RIECHELSON, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/16/2020.]
July 9, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #11 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice TO ADMIT BRETT A. SCHATZ, ESQ.. Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/16/2020.]
July 9, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Certificate of Brett a. Schatz, Esq., submitted by K. Riechelson on 6/27/2019 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (JB, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/16/2020.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice TO ADMIT BRETT A. SCHATZ, ESQ. by ADAMS, NASH & HASKELL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(RIECHELSON, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/16/2020.]
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Jose L. Linares no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/29/19. (ak, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/16/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #7 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), 12(b)(3), and 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HOLVEY, PATRICK) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/16/2020.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by ADAMS, NASH & HASKELL, INC. re #7 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), 12(b)(3), and 12(b)(6) (RIECHELSON, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/16/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), 12(b)(3), and 12(b)(6). Motion set for 6/3/2019 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/16/2020.]
April 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), 12(b)(3), and 12(b)(6) by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 5/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Kimberly Wells, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(HOLVEY, PATRICK) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/16/2020.]
April 1, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/29/2019. (JB, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/16/2020.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Attorney SUSAN R MILLENKY for THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA added. (MILLENKY, SUSAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/16/2020.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by ADAMS, NASH & HASKELL, INC..(RIECHELSON, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/16/2020.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADAMS, NASH & HASKELL, INC.. (COHEN, PHILIP) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/16/2020.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 AO120 Trademark Form filed. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/16/2020.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/16/2020.]
February 6, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint #1 filed by Philip Cohen on 1/31/2019 was submitted with a Corporate Disclosure Statement as an attachment. PLEASE RESUBMIT the Corporate Disclosure Statement USING the event CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT found under Other Filings -> Other Documents. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/16/2020.]
January 31, 2019 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Jose L. Linares and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. (ak, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/16/2020.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9361503) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ADAMS, NASH & HASKELL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Disclosure Statement, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Summons)(COHEN, PHILIP) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADAMS, NASH & HASKELL, INC. v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Patrick C Holvey
Represented By: Carrie E. Rosato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAMS, NASH & HASKELL, INC.
Represented By: Ashley Elise Bouchez
Represented By: Attison L. Barnes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?