DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA v. EXXON MOBIL CORP. et al
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Defendant: EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL CORP., SHELL OIL COMPANY, CHEVRON U.S.A. INC., ROYAL DUTCH SHELL PLC, BP P.L.C., BP AMERICA INC. and CHEVRON CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv01932
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM re #45 MOTION to Remand filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sher, Victor)
August 17, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION to Remand to State Court by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Sher, Victor); Modified event and text on 8/18/2020 (ztth).
August 10, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T. Heartney on behalf of BP AMERICA INC., BP P.L.C. (Heartney, Matthew)
August 10, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan W. Hughes on behalf of BP AMERICA INC., BP P.L.C. (Hughes, Jonathan)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/6/2020. (lctjk3)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #40 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Matthew T. Heartney is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter.Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/4/2020. (lctjk3)
August 4, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Lombardo on behalf of BP AMERICA INC., BP P.L.C. (Lombardo, John)
August 4, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mathew T. Heartney, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7422010. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BP AMERICA INC., BP P.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew T. Heartney in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shenkman, Ethan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana E. Reiter on behalf of BP AMERICA INC., BP P.L.C. (Reiter, Diana)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jonathan W. Hughes is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/31/2020. (lctjk3)
July 30, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy G. Milburn on behalf of BP AMERICA INC., BP P.L.C. (Milburn, Nancy)
July 29, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan W. Hughes, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7401343. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BP AMERICA INC., BP P.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan W. Hughes in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shenkman, Ethan)
July 29, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor Marc Sher on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Sher, Victor)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Diana E. Reiter is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/29/2020. (lctjk3)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #34 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney John D. Lombardo is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/29/2020. (lctjk3)
July 28, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Diana E. Reiter, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7396302. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BP AMERICA INC., BP P.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diana E. Reiter in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shenkman, Ethan)
July 28, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John D. Lombardo, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BDCDC-7396248. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BP AMERICA INC., BP P.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Lombardo in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shenkman, Ethan)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Victor M. Sher is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/28/2020. (lctjk3)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Nancy G. Milburn is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/28/2020. (lctjk3)
July 28, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Victor M. Sher, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7393595. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Victor M. Sher, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Zavareei, Hassan)
July 28, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna C. Haac on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Haac, Anna)
July 28, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine M Aizpuru on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Aizpuru, Katherine)
July 28, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Hassan A. Zavareei on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Zavareei, Hassan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nancy G. Milburn, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7377514. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BP AMERICA INC., BP P.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nancy G. Milburn in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shenkman, Ethan)
July 23, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Notice of Motion to Remand due by 8/17/2020. (zkh)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' #19 Joint Motion. The Court construes the parties' #19 First Stipulation and Proposed Order to Modify Briefing Schedules and Page Limits as a Motion to do so. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff shall file its Notice of Motion to Remand by August 17, 2020; (2) Plaintiff shall file its Motion to Remand, not to exceed 60 pages, by August 31, 2020; (3) Defendants shall file their consolidated opposition, not to exceed 60 pages, by October 15, 2020; (4) any separate opposition a Defendant deems it necessary to file shall not exceed ten pages and shall also be filed by October 15, 2020; and (5) Plaintiff shall file its reply, not to exceed 35 pages as to Defendants' consolidated opposition and 10 pages as to any separate opposition, by November 16, 2020. It is further ORDERED that deadlines for Rule 26(a) disclosures, a Rule 16(b) scheduling order, and Defendants' answers or motions to dismiss are STAYED until after the Court rules on Plaintiff's forthcoming motion to remand. It is further ORDERED that, should the Court deny Plaintiff's motion to remand, the parties shall, jointly if possible, file a proposed briefing schedule for any motions to dismiss within seven days of the Court's ruling. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/23/2020. (lctjk3)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Matthew T. Heartney's affidavit states that he is in good standing with all bars to which he has been admitted, but it does not include "a certification that the attorney either has or has not been disciplined by any bar, and if the attorney has been disciplined by any bar, the circumstances and details of the discipline" as required by Local Civil Rule 83.2(d). Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that his #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/23/2020. (lctjk3)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney John D. Lombardo's affidavit states that he is in good standing with all bars to which he has been admitted, but it does not include "a certification that the attorney either has or has not been disciplined by any bar, and if the attorney has been disciplined by any bar, the circumstances and details of the discipline" as required by Local Civil Rule 83.2(d). Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that his #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/23/2020. (lctjk3)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jonathan W. Hughes's affidavit states that he is in good standing with all bars to which he has been admitted, but it does not include "a certification that the attorney either has or has not been disciplined by any bar, and if the attorney has been disciplined by any bar, the circumstances and details of the discipline" as required by Local Civil Rule 83.2(d). Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that his #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/23/2020. (lctjk3)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Diana E. Reiter's affidavit states that she is in good standing with all bars to which she has been admitted, but it does not include "a certification that the attorney either has or has not been disciplined by any bar, and if the attorney has been disciplined by any bar, the circumstances and details of the discipline" as required by Local Civil Rule 83.2(d). Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that her #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/23/2020. (lctjk3)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Nancy G. Milburn's affidavit states that she is in good standing with all bars to which she has been admitted, but it does not include "a certification that the attorney either has or has not been disciplined by any bar, and if the attorney has been disciplined by any bar, the circumstances and details of the discipline" as required by Local Civil Rule 83.2(d). Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that her #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/23/2020. (lctjk3)
July 22, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- MATTHEW T. HEARTNEY, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7374272. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BP AMERICA INC., BP P.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF MATTHEW T. HEARTNEY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shenkman, Ethan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- JOHN D. LOMBARDO, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7374195. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BP AMERICA INC., BP P.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF JOHN D. LOMBARDO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shenkman, Ethan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- JONATHAN W. HUGHES, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7374175. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BP AMERICA INC., BP P.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF JONATHAN W. HUGHES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shenkman, Ethan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- DIANA E. REITER, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7374133. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BP AMERICA INC., BP P.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF DIANA E. REITER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shenkman, Ethan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT re #23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nancy G. Milburn, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7373945. Fee Status: Fee Paid. DECLARATION OF NANCY G. MILBURN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE by BP AMERICA INC., BP P.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shenkman, Ethan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nancy G. Milburn, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7373945. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BP AMERICA INC., BP P.L.C. (Shenkman, Ethan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 22 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BP AMERICA INC., BP P.L.C. (Shenkman, Ethan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan G. Shenkman on behalf of BP AMERICA INC., BP P.L.C. (Shenkman, Ethan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel John Toal on behalf of EXXON MOBIL CORP., EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Toal, Daniel)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Daniel J. Toal is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/21/2020. (lctjk3)
July 20, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Briefing Schedules and Page Limits by CHEVRON CORPORATION, CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.. (Boutrous, Theodore)
July 20, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal (zmc)
July 20, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EXXON MOBIL CORP., EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION re #1 Notice of Removal,, #5 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests, #3 Notice of Appearance, #6 Notice of Appearance . (Wells, Theodore)
July 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by BP AMERICA INC., BP P.L.C. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Shenkman, Ethan)
July 17, 2020 Filing 15 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CHEVRON CORPORATION, CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. (Boutrous, Theodore)
July 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan J. Crimmins on behalf of ROYAL DUTCH SHELL PLC, SHELL OIL COMPANY (Crimmins, Brendan)
July 17, 2020 Filing 13 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ROYAL DUTCH SHELL PLC, SHELL OIL COMPANY (Frederick, David)
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by ROYAL DUTCH SHELL PLC, SHELL OIL COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Frederick, David)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David Charles Frederick on behalf of ROYAL DUTCH SHELL PLC, SHELL OIL COMPANY (Frederick, David)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S. Lipshutz on behalf of CHEVRON CORPORATION, CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. (Lipshutz, Joshua)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Hungar on behalf of CHEVRON CORPORATION, CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. (Hungar, Thomas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by CHEVRON CORPORATION, CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Boutrous, Theodore)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr on behalf of CHEVRON CORPORATION, CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. (Boutrous, Theodore)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Conlon on behalf of EXXON MOBIL CORP., EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Conlon, Patrick)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EXXON MOBIL CORP., EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Wells, Theodore)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel J. Toal, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7353862. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by EXXON MOBIL CORP., EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel J. Toal, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wells, Theodore)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin A. Anderson on behalf of EXXON MOBIL CORP., EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Anderson, Justin)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by EXXON MOBIL CORP., EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION. Case related to Case No. 20-cv-1815. (Wells, Theodore)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia Civil Division, case number 2020 CA 002892 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-7353661 filed by EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(Wells, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA v. EXXON MOBIL CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Kathleen M. Konopka
Represented By: Victor Marc Sher
Represented By: Anna C. Haac
Represented By: Hassan A. Zavareei
Represented By: Katherine M Aizpuru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr.
Represented By: Justin A. Anderson
Represented By: Patrick J. Conlon
Represented By: Daniel John Toal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXXON MOBIL CORP.
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr.
Represented By: Justin A. Anderson
Represented By: Patrick J. Conlon
Represented By: Daniel John Toal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELL OIL COMPANY
Represented By: Brendan J. Crimmins
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.
Represented By: Joshua S. Lipshutz
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas G. Hungar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROYAL DUTCH SHELL PLC
Represented By: Brendan J. Crimmins
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP P.L.C.
Represented By: Nancy G. Milburn
Represented By: Diana E. Reiter
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Represented By: Matthew T. Heartney
Represented By: John D. Lombardo
Represented By: Ethan G. Shenkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP AMERICA INC.
Represented By: Nancy G. Milburn
Represented By: Diana E. Reiter
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Represented By: Matthew T. Heartney
Represented By: John D. Lombardo
Represented By: Ethan G. Shenkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEVRON CORPORATION
Represented By: Joshua S. Lipshutz
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas G. Hungar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?