NELSON v. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: BERNARD DAVID NELSON
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES and KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv01934
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI served on 7/27/2020 (Seagrave, Alan)
August 9, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 7/27/2020 (Seagrave, Alan)
August 9, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/27/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/25/2020. (Seagrave, Alan)
August 9, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/27/2020. (Seagrave, Alan)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Burch on behalf of All Defendants (Burch, Alan)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/03/2020. (DM)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
July 20, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (adh, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7354602) filed by BERNARD DAVID NELSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Seagrave, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NELSON v. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERNARD DAVID NELSON
Represented By: Alan Seagrave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Alan Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II
Represented By: Alan Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?