LA RIVA et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Plaintiff: CLAIRE COOK, NICOLE ROUSSELL, GLORIA LA RIVA and SEAN BLACKMON
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Case Number: 1:2020cv01937
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Schoen, David)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Dkt. #14 , it is hereby ORDERED that the case is dismissed. The Clerk of Court is hereby ORDERED to terminate the case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/18/2020. (lcrdm3)
August 13, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BOARD OF ELECTIONS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bluming, Micah) Modified on 8/13/2020 (ztd).
August 13, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/18/2020; Reply due by 8/24/2020. (kt)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time, #13 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #9 , on or before August 18, 2020, and Plaintiffs' shall file their reply to Defendant's response on or before August 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/13/2020. (lcrdm3)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BOARD OF ELECTIONS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bluming, Micah)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's consent motion for extension of time #12 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its response to the Plaintiff's complaint on or before September 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/6/20. (lcrdm3, )
July 30, 2020 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT Filed by All Parties by SEAN BLACKMON, CLAIRE COOK, GLORIA LA RIVA, NICOLE ROUSSELL. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Schoen, David)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report #11 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's opposition to the motion for preliminary injunction shall be filed on or before August 14, 2020 and Plaintiff's reply shall be due on or before August 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/30/20. (lcrdm3, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 ERRATA by SEAN BLACKMON, CLAIRE COOK, GLORIA LA RIVA, NICOLE ROUSSELL #9 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Requesting Expedited Consideration - Election Related) filed by GLORIA LA RIVA, CLAIRE COOK, NICOLE ROUSSELL, SEAN BLACKMON. (Schoen, David)
July 27, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/27/2020. Defendants' Response due by 7/31/2020; Plaintiffs' Reply due by end of day on 8/3/2020; Joint Status Report due by end of day on 7/30/2020. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Plaintiff's emergency motion for preliminary injunction #9 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference on July 27, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. The Clerk of Court is directed to provide the parties with dial-in information. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/27/20. (lcrdm3, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Requesting Expedited Consideration - Election Related) by SEAN BLACKMON, CLAIRE COOK, GLORIA LA RIVA, NICOLE ROUSSELL (Attachments: #1 Declaration Exh. "1" - Gloria La Riva Declaration, #2 Declaration Exh. "2" Richard Winger Declaration and C.V.)(Schoen, David)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Shani Brown on behalf of All Defendants (Brown, Shani)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Micah Ian Bluming on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BOARD OF ELECTIONS (Bluming, Micah)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on the Mayor of the District of Columbia. Date of Service Upon the Mayor for the District of Columbia on 07/21/2020. (Schoen, David)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 7/21/2020. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 8/11/2020. (Schoen, David)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to DC Mayor, District of Columbia Attorney General(ztd) Modified on 7/21/2020 (ztd).
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to DC Mayor re #2 Errata filed by GLORIA LA RIVA, SEAN BLACKMON, NICOLE ROUSSELL, CLAIRE COOK. Related document: #2 Errata filed by GLORIA LA RIVA, CLAIRE COOK, NICOLE ROUSSELL, SEAN BLACKMON. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons for DC Attorney General)(Schoen, David)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA to Complaint (adding Parties' addresses) by SEAN BLACKMON, CLAIRE COOK, GLORIA LA RIVA, NICOLE ROUSSELL #1 Complaint, filed by GLORIA LA RIVA, CLAIRE COOK, NICOLE ROUSSELL, SEAN BLACKMON. (Schoen, David)
July 20, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, )
July 20, 2020 SUMMONS Not Issued as to DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BOARD OF ELECTIONS (adh, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief against DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BOARD OF ELECTIONS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7355388) filed by GLORIA LA RIVA, SEAN BLACKMON, NICOLE ROUSSELL, CLAIRE COOK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Schoen, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LA RIVA et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAIRE COOK
Represented By: David I. Schoen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLE ROUSSELL
Represented By: David I. Schoen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA LA RIVA
Represented By: David I. Schoen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN BLACKMON
Represented By: David I. Schoen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Represented By: Shani Brown
Represented By: Micah Ian Bluming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?