STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING v. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Plaintiff: STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING
Defendant: U S Customs and Border Protection and U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Case Number: 1:2020cv01939
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 ERRATA re #11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING. (Herrick, Peter)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/12/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/11/2020. (Herrick, Peter)
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 7/31/2020 (Herrick, Peter)
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General July 30, 2020. (Herrick, Peter)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/28/2020. (jag)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
July 21, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 ERRATA by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING. (Herrick, Peter)
July 19, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING (Herrick, Peter) Modified on 7/21/2020 to correct docket entry text (zsb).
July 19, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING (Herrick, Peter) Modified on 7/21/2020 to correct docket entry text (zsb).
July 19, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING (Herrick, Peter) Modified on 7/21/2020 to correct docket entry text (zsb).
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING filed by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING.(Herrick, Peter)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U S Customs and Border Protection ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7356145) filed by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING.(Herrick, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING v. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING
Represented By: Peter S. Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?