BETHEL v. RODRIGUEZ et al
Plaintiff: PLAINTIFF LARRY BETHEL and LARRY BETHEL
Defendant: HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., NELSON BENTON, JOSE RODRIGUEZ, DEFENDANT DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, HOME DEPOT U.S.A. and METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT
Consolidated Plaintiff: RONALD DIXON
Case Number: 1:2020cv01940
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by HOME DEPOT U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redlined copy of Amended Answer)(Stewart, Rachel)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT (Medley, Philip)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct second amendment complaint by LARRY BETHEL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Dixon, Ronald) Modified event title on 9/8/2020 (znmw).
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Philip Alexander Medley (Medley, Philip)
August 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/4/2020. (tj)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time File Response. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Metropolitan Police Department shall respond to the amended complaint on or before September 4, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/21/2020. (lcrc3)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint by METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT (Medley, Philip)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Alexander Medley on behalf of METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT (Medley, Philip)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HOME DEPOT U.S.A. (Stewart, Rachel)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to 2 Amended Complaint, by HOME DEPOT U.S.A..(Stewart, Rachel)
July 23, 2020 SUMMONS Not Issued as to METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT (zmc)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to NELSON BENTON, HOME DEPOT U.S.A., JOSE RODRIGUEZ, and District of Columbia Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
July 23, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmc)
July 23, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 2 Amended Complaint, #4 Errata, was entered in error: duplicate entry. Counsel refiled corrected pleadings in #3 . (zmc)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 ENTERED IN ERROR.....ERRATA signed complaint as attorney for plaintiff by RONALD DIXON (2 in 1:20-cv-01940, 1 in 1:20-cv-01942) Amended Complaint, (1 in 1:20-cv-01940) Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Errata)Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01940, 1:20-cv-01942(Dixon, Ronald) Modified on 7/23/2020 (zmc).
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 ERRATA by LARRY BETHEL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dixon, Ronald) Modified on 7/23/2020 to correct docket entry text (zsb).
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 ENTERED IN ERROR.....AMENDED COMPLAINT 1:20-cv-01940 against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by RONALD DIXON. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01940, 1:20-cv-01942(Dixon, Ronald) Modified on 7/23/2020 (zmc).
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7356547) filed by LARRY BETHEL. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dixon, Ronald) Modified on 7/23/2020 to correct docket entry text (zsb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BETHEL v. RODRIGUEZ et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: RONALD DIXON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NELSON BENTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEFENDANT DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOME DEPOT U.S.A.
Represented By: Rachel Lynn Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Philip Alexander Medley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PLAINTIFF LARRY BETHEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY BETHEL
Represented By: Ronald Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?