PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Plaintiff: PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.
Defendant: NATIONAL PASSENGER RAILROAD CORPORATION d/b/a Amtrak and NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION doing business as AMTRAK
Case Number: 1:2020cv01948
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, the defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint on or before September 23, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 2, 2020. (lcdlf2)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amunson, Jessica)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Ring Amunson on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (Amunson, Jessica)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION served on 8/6/2020 (Joshi, Nandan)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/10/2020. (Joshi, Nandan)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/10/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/9/2020. (Joshi, Nandan)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 21, 2020. (lcdlf2)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL PASSENGER RAILROAD CORPORATION. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Main Document 3 replaced to correct summons form on 7/28/2020) (zmc)
July 21, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmc)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. (Joshi, Nandan)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL PASSENGER RAILROAD CORPORATION d/b/a AMTRAK ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7360076) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Amtrak Summons, #3 Summons US Atty Summons, #4 Summons AG Summons)(Joshi, Nandan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL PASSENGER RAILROAD CORPORATION d/b/a Amtrak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION doing business as AMTRAK
Represented By: Jessica Ring Amunson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.
Represented By: Nandan M. Joshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?