ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENT HOSPITAL, UPPER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, STRONG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HIGHLAND HOSPITAL, MCLAREN MACOMB, MCLAREN OAKLAND, JOHN H. STROGER, JR., HOSPITAL OF COOK COUNTY, RUSH UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, RUSH COPLEY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, RUSH OAK PARK HOSPITAL, INC., MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF SOUTH BEND, MCLAREN GREATER LANSING, MCLAREN FLINT, MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL and ELKHART GENERAL HOSPITAL
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv01957
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 CASE CONSOLIDATED. Case 20-cv-1957 has been consolidated with 20-cv-139 pursuant to a MINUTE ORDER entered 08/18/2020. From this date forward all pleadings shall be filed ONLY in Civil Action No. 20-cv-139. The parties are advised NOT to elect to SPREAD text when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails ( (zrdj)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) CONSOLIDATING, upon consideration of defendant's #10 and plaintiffs' #11 Responses to Order to Show Cause entered on August 6, 2020, this case, Civil Case No. 20-cv-1957, with Ascension Borgess Hosp. v. Azar, Civil Case No. 20-cv-139, for all purposes; DIRECTING the parties to make all filings in these consolidated cases only in Civil Case No. 20-cv-139; further DIRECTING the parties, by September 1, 2020, jointly to submit a proposed schedule for the filing of any consolidated complaint and briefing on any renewed motion to dismiss in the consolidated actions; and further DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 18, 2020. (lcbah4)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Consolidation by ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, ELKHART GENERAL HOSPITAL, HIGHLAND HOSPITAL, JOHN H. STROGER, JR., HOSPITAL OF COOK COUNTY, MCLAREN FLINT, MCLAREN GREATER LANSING, MCLAREN MACOMB, MCLAREN OAKLAND, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF SOUTH BEND, MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL, PROVIDENT HOSPITAL, RUSH COPLEY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, RUSH OAK PARK HOSPITAL, INC., RUSH UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, STRONG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, UPPER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER re Order (Howk, Andrew) Modified event title on 8/17/2020 (znmw).
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by ALEX M. AZAR, II filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II. (Hammond, Derek)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants (Hammond, Derek)
August 7, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties' response to the Court's Show Cause Order due by 8/13/2020. (hmc)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ORDERING the parties, by August 13, 2020, to SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be consolidated with Ascension Borgess Hosp. v. Azar, 20-cv-139. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 6, 2020. (lcbah4)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 21, 2020. (lcbah3)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
July 21, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmc)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren N. Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rodriguez, Lauren)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by N. Kent Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, N.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, ELKHART GENERAL HOSPITAL, HIGHLAND HOSPITAL, JOHN H. STROGER, JR., HOSPITAL OF COOK COUNTY, MCLAREN FLINT, MCLAREN GREATER LANSING, MCLAREN MACOMB, MCLAREN OAKLAND, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF SOUTH BEND, MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL, PROVIDENT HOSPITAL, RUSH COPLEY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, RUSH OAK PARK HOSPITAL, INC., RUSH UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, STRONG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, UPPER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER (Howk, Andrew)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-139. (Rodriguez, Lauren)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew B. Howk on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Howk, Andrew)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7361739) filed by MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF SOUTH BEND, MCLAREN FLINT, STRONG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER, UPPER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, RUSH UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENT HOSPITAL, JOHN H. STROGER, JR., HOSPITAL OF COOK COUNTY, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, MCLAREN MACOMB, MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL, RUSH COPLEY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, RUSH OAK PARK HOSPITAL, INC., MCLAREN GREATER LANSING, ELKHART GENERAL HOSPITAL, MCLAREN OAKLAND, HIGHLAND HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Alex Azar, #3 Summons Summons to Michael Sherwin, #4 Summons Summons to William Barr)(Howk, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENT HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPPER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRONG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIGHLAND HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCLAREN MACOMB
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCLAREN OAKLAND
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN H. STROGER, JR., HOSPITAL OF COOK COUNTY
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSH UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSH COPLEY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSH OAK PARK HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF SOUTH BEND
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCLAREN GREATER LANSING
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCLAREN FLINT
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELKHART GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: Lauren N. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew B. Howk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Derek S. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?