BOYD v. BARR
Petitioner: DANIEL P. BOYD
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR
Case Number: 1:2020cv02002
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Receipt on 08/28/2020 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 1:20-cv-01546 sent by Middle District of Pennsylvania. (zrdj)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred to the USDC for the Middle District of Pennsylvania, pursuant to the Court Order entered 08/07/20. Sent to Court via Electronically. (zrdj)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER transferring case. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/7/2020. (lctjk3)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 4616103663) filed by DANIEL P. BOYD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(zjf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOYD v. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DANIEL P. BOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?