TEXAS CIVIL RIGHTS PROJECT v. WOLF et al
Plaintiff: TEXAS CIVIL RIGHTS PROJECT
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II, RODNEY S. SCOTT, MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, CHAD F. WOLF, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, TODD C. OWEN and MARK A. MORGAN
Case Number: 1:2020cv02035
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 8:1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DISMISSING, in light of the plaintiffs' #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice, this case without prejudice, since defendants have filed neither an answer to the complaint nor a motion for summary judgment in this case, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i); and further DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 10, 2020. (lcbah2)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TEXAS CIVIL RIGHTS PROJECT (Perez, Celso)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spitzer, Arthur)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 31, 2020. (lcbah2)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE (Corrected Notice) to the Court by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, CHAD F. WOLF re #6 Notice (Other) (Lin, Jean)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE to the Court by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, CHAD F. WOLF (Lin, Jean)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (9) Issued Electronically as to MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, CHAD F. WOLF, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
July 27, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, )
July 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by TEXAS CIVIL RIGHTS PROJECT re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Perez, Celso)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Statement Regarding Other Pending Cases by TEXAS CIVIL RIGHTS PROJECT (Perez, Celso)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO #4 NOTICE FILED 7/26/2020..... MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by TEXAS CIVIL RIGHTS PROJECT (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit to Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3 Declaration of Daniel Galindo, #4 Declaration of Efren C. Olivares, #5 Declaration of Linda Corchado, #6 Declaration of Maria Odom, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Perez, Celso) Modified on 7/30/2020 (znmw).
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, CHAD F. WOLF ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7384883) filed by TEXAS CIVIL RIGHTS PROJECT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Coversheet, #2 Summons for All Defendants, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General)(Perez, Celso)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TEXAS CIVIL RIGHTS PROJECT v. WOLF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RODNEY S. SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD F. WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT R. REDFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD C. OWEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK A. MORGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEXAS CIVIL RIGHTS PROJECT
Represented By: Celso Perez
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?