DON'T SHOOT PORTLAND et al v. WOLF et al
Plaintiff: DEMETRIA HESTER, DANIALLE JAMES, BEVERLEY BARNUM, LISA KIPERSZTOK, DON'T SHOOT PORTLAND, WALL OF MOMS and SABRINA CERQUERA
Defendant: L. ERIC PATTERSON, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE, DONALD W. WASHINGTON, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, CHAD F. WOLF, WILLIAM BARR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, KEN CUCCINELLI, MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, MARK A. MORGAN, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION and KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv02040
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C. Lynch on behalf of All Defendants (Lynch, Jason)
August 26, 2020 Filing 17 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MATTHEW T. ALBENCE served on 8/11/2020; WILLIAM BARR served on 8/11/2020; KEN CUCCINELLI served on 8/11/2020; FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE served on 8/11/2020; MARK A. MORGAN served on 8/11/2020; L. ERIC PATTERSON served on 8/11/2020; U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 8/11/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 8/11/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/11/2020; U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 8/11/2020; U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE served on 8/11/2020; DONALD W. WASHINGTON served on 8/11/2020; CHAD F. WOLF served on 8/11/2020 (O'Neil, David) Modified on 8/26/2020 (ztd).
August 26, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #17 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant; emailed to daoneil@debevoise.com, cc'd 16 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please refile document, 3. Refile as Affidavit found under Other Documents. The attached document just indicates that the documents were taken to the post office. Need receipts that docs have been delivered. (ztd, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Deana K El-Mallawany on behalf of All Plaintiffs (El-Mallawany, Deana)
August 4, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Kwon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kwon, Christine)
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica A. Marsden on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Marsden, Jessica)
July 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Landrum von Bokern on behalf of All Defendants (von Bokern, Jordan)
July 29, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ztd) Modified on 7/29/2020 (ztd).
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel F. Homer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Homer, Rachel)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 , #9 , and #10 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/29/20. (lccrc1)
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Deana K. El-Mallawany, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7396508. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BEVERLEY BARNUM, SABRINA CERQUERA, DON'T SHOOT PORTLAND, DEMETRIA HESTER, DANIALLE JAMES, LISA KIPERSZTOK, WALL OF MOMS (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deana K. El-Mallawany, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Berwick, Benjamin)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christine Kwon, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7396454. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BEVERLEY BARNUM, SABRINA CERQUERA, DON'T SHOOT PORTLAND, DEMETRIA HESTER, DANIALLE JAMES, LISA KIPERSZTOK, WALL OF MOMS (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christine Kwon, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Berwick, Benjamin)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jessica A. Marsden, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7396427. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BEVERLEY BARNUM, SABRINA CERQUERA, DON'T SHOOT PORTLAND, DEMETRIA HESTER, DANIALLE JAMES, LISA KIPERSZTOK, WALL OF MOMS (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jessica A. Marsden, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Berwick, Benjamin)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Leon Berwick on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Berwick, Benjamin)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin G. Florence on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Florence, Justin)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to U.S. Attorney General William P. Barr re #1 Complaint,,,, filed by LISA KIPERSZTOK, WALL OF MOMS, DON'T SHOOT PORTLAND, DANIALLE JAMES, BEVERLEY BARNUM, SABRINA CERQUERA, DEMETRIA HESTER. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,, filed by BEVERLEY BARNUM, WALL OF MOMS, LISA KIPERSZTOK, DANIALLE JAMES, DEMETRIA HESTER, DON'T SHOOT PORTLAND, SABRINA CERQUERA. (Attachments: #1 Summons to United State Attorney's Office for the District of Columbia, #2 Summons to U.S. Customs and Border Protection)(O'Neil, David)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (12) Issued Electronically as to MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, KEN CUCCINELLI, FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, MARK A. MORGAN, L. ERIC PATTERSON, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE, DONALD W. WASHINGTON, CHAD F. WOLF. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
July 28, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmc)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 ERRATA / Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by BEVERLEY BARNUM, SABRINA CERQUERA, DON'T SHOOT PORTLAND, DEMETRIA HESTER, DANIALLE JAMES, LISA KIPERSZTOK, WALL OF MOMS. (O'Neil, David)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests indicating no parent corporation and no publicly-held corporation owns 10% or more of its stock. by BEVERLEY BARNUM, SABRINA CERQUERA, DON'T SHOOT PORTLAND, DEMETRIA HESTER, DANIALLE JAMES, LISA KIPERSZTOK, WALL OF MOMS (O'Neil, David)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, KEN CUCCINELLI, FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, MARK A. MORGAN, L. ERIC PATTERSON, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE, DONALD W. WASHINGTON, CHAD F. WOLF ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7389318) filed by LISA KIPERSZTOK, WALL OF MOMS, DON'T SHOOT PORTLAND, DANIALLE JAMES, BEVERLEY BARNUM, SABRINA CERQUERA, DEMETRIA HESTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Chad F. Wolf, #3 Summons to Ken Cuccinelli, #4 Summons to Mark A. Morgan, #5 Summons to Matthew T. Albence, #6 Summons to L. Eric Patterson, #7 Summons to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, #8 Summons to U.S. Customs and Border Protection, #9 Summons to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, #10 Summons to Federal Protective Service, #11 Summons to William Barr, #12 Summons to Donald W. Washington, #13 Summons to U.S. Department of Justice, #14 Summons to U.S. Marshals Service)(O'Neil, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DON'T SHOOT PORTLAND et al v. WOLF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMETRIA HESTER
Represented By: David A. O'Neil
Represented By: Christine Kwon
Represented By: Benjamin Leon Berwick
Represented By: Justin G. Florence
Represented By: Jessica A. Marsden
Represented By: Deana K El-Mallawany
Represented By: Rachel F. Homer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIALLE JAMES
Represented By: David A. O'Neil
Represented By: Christine Kwon
Represented By: Benjamin Leon Berwick
Represented By: Justin G. Florence
Represented By: Jessica A. Marsden
Represented By: Deana K El-Mallawany
Represented By: Rachel F. Homer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEVERLEY BARNUM
Represented By: David A. O'Neil
Represented By: Christine Kwon
Represented By: Benjamin Leon Berwick
Represented By: Justin G. Florence
Represented By: Deana K El-Mallawany
Represented By: Jessica A. Marsden
Represented By: Rachel F. Homer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA KIPERSZTOK
Represented By: David A. O'Neil
Represented By: Christine Kwon
Represented By: Benjamin Leon Berwick
Represented By: Justin G. Florence
Represented By: Jessica A. Marsden
Represented By: Deana K El-Mallawany
Represented By: Rachel F. Homer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DON'T SHOOT PORTLAND
Represented By: David A. O'Neil
Represented By: Christine Kwon
Represented By: Benjamin Leon Berwick
Represented By: Justin G. Florence
Represented By: Jessica A. Marsden
Represented By: Deana K El-Mallawany
Represented By: Rachel F. Homer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALL OF MOMS
Represented By: David A. O'Neil
Represented By: Christine Kwon
Represented By: Benjamin Leon Berwick
Represented By: Justin G. Florence
Represented By: Jessica A. Marsden
Represented By: Deana K El-Mallawany
Represented By: Rachel F. Homer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SABRINA CERQUERA
Represented By: David A. O'Neil
Represented By: Christine Kwon
Represented By: Benjamin Leon Berwick
Represented By: Justin G. Florence
Represented By: Jessica A. Marsden
Represented By: Deana K El-Mallawany
Represented By: Rachel F. Homer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. ERIC PATTERSON
Represented By: Jordan Landrum von Bokern
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE
Represented By: Jordan Landrum von Bokern
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD W. WASHINGTON
Represented By: Jordan Landrum von Bokern
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: Jordan Landrum von Bokern
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD F. WOLF
Represented By: Jordan Landrum von Bokern
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: Jordan Landrum von Bokern
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Jordan Landrum von Bokern
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Jordan Landrum von Bokern
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE
Represented By: Jordan Landrum von Bokern
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEN CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE
Represented By: Jordan Landrum von Bokern
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK A. MORGAN
Represented By: Jordan Landrum von Bokern
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Represented By: Jordan Landrum von Bokern
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II
Represented By: Jordan Landrum von Bokern
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?