IMMIGRANT INVESTORS ASSOCIATION, INC. v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Plaintiff: IMMIGRANT INVESTORS ASSOCIATION, INC. doing business as INVEST IN THE USA ("IIUSA")
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Not Classified By Court: INVEST IN THE USA ("IIUSA" and DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2020cv02082
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Brudy-Everett, Kristin)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/20/20. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
July 31, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmc)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7404951) filed by INVEST IN THE USA ("IIUSA". (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons DHS Summons, #3 Summons USCIS SUmmons)(Grau, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IMMIGRANT INVESTORS ASSOCIATION, INC. v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: INVEST IN THE USA ("IIUSA"
Represented By: Aaron Louis Grau, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Kristin Brudy-Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Kristin Brudy-Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IMMIGRANT INVESTORS ASSOCIATION, INC. doing business as INVEST IN THE USA ("IIUSA")
Represented By: Aaron Louis Grau, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?