PROTECTIVE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Plaintiff: PROTECTIVE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02101
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Initial Scheduling Conference is hereby set for October 23, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. to take place telephonically. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a report and a proposed scheduling order pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3(d) on or before October 16, 2020. See attached order for details. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk will provide the parties with the teleconference number and access code. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/28/2020. (lcrdm1)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (LaMontagne, Laurel)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against PROTECTIVE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Counterclaim - Policy, #2 Exhibit B to Counterclaim - Application)(LaMontagne, Laurel)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's consent motion for extension of time, Dkt. #5 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before September 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/18/2020. (lcrdm1)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kornobis, Theodore)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall comply with the directives set forth in the Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/3/2020. (lcrdm1)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECTIVE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Kurtz, Chad)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
August 3, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7411681) filed by PROTECTIVE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Kurtz, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PROTECTIVE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROTECTIVE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Chad E. Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Theodore Lawrence Kornobis
Represented By: Laurel LaMontagne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?